Original Case: 3:15-cv-00391

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv.pr-02208
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Terminated:Sep 24, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 25, 2018 4:31 AM EDT
Amicus Supporting Appellant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Andrew John Pincus
MAYER BROWN, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
TRANS UNION LLC
Represented By
Gibson Sinclair Wright
MORRIS & MORRIS
contact info
Stephen Julian Newman
STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN LLP
contact info
David W. Moon
STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN LLP
contact info
Michael R. Ward
MCCANDLISH HOLTON PC
contact info
Daniel C. Shatz
STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN LLP
contact info
Brian C. Frontino
STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN LLP
contact info
Alisa M. Taormina
STROOCK & STROOCK & LAVAN LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
CAROLYN CLARK
Represented By
James A. Francis
FRANCIS & MAILMAN, P.C.
contact info
John Soumilas
FRANCIS & MAILMAN, P.C.
contact info
Kristi Cahoon Kelly
KELLY & CRANDALL PLC
contact info
Craig Carley Marchiando
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Matthew James Erausquin
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES
contact info
Casey Shannon Nash
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES
contact info
Leonard Anthony Bennett
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth W. Hanes
CONSUMER LITIGATION ASSOCIATES, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/25/2018 4:27 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00391-MHL. Case manager: JMoore. 17-2208 JHM [Entered: 10/17/2017 12:05 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs
Att: 2 1 pgs
2 2 1 pgs Case transferred from miscellaneous docket 17-169. Record complete? Yes. 17-2208 JHM [Entered: 10/17/2017 12:10 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Brian C. Frontino for Trans Union LLC, Mr. Stephen Julian Newman for Trans Union LLC, Alisa M. Taormina for Trans Union LLC, Michael R. Ward for Trans Union LLC and Gibson Sinclair Wright for Trans Union LLC - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/16/2017 Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00391-MHL.. 17-2208 JHM [Entered: 10/17/2017 12:12 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:15-cv-00391-MHL.. 17-2208 JHM [Entered: 10/17/2017 12:17 PM]
Related: [-]