Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-23535

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:17-ap-08291
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2017
Terminated:May 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
PORKY PRODUCTS, INC.
400 Port Carteret Drive
Carteret, NJ 07008
Represented By
PORKY PRODUCTS, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Foods, Inc. II
Rich Michaelson Magaliff Moser, LLP 335 Madison Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Traurig
Diconza Traurig LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, May 17, 2018
12 12 order Motion, Approve Thu 05/17 3:49 PM
Order signed on 5/17/2018 Authorizing Entry Into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (A) Jetro Cash And Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, Jrd Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, Jrd Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry And Jetro Cash & Carry; (B) Porky Products, Inc.; (C) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; And (D) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Related [+]. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-] 9
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/17 4:22 PM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8291 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Wed 05/16 2:04 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 : Certificate of No Objection of Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, April 19, 2018
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 04/19 5:36 PM
Affidavit of Service : Affidavit of Service of Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry Into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 9
9 9 motion Motion, Approve Thu 04/19 1:06 PM
Motion to Approve : Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Presentment Date: May 14, 2018 at 12:00 Noon (EST). Objection Deadline: May 14, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. (EST) filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment
Att: 2 Exhibits A - D: Settlement Agreements
Att: 3 Exhibit E: Proposed Order
Monday, February 26, 2018
8 8 plan Disclosure Statement Mon 02/26 2:26 PM
Disclosure Statement Preliminary Disclosures filed by Donna L. Thompson on behalf of PORKY PRODUCTS, INC.. (Thompson, Donna)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/12 4:23 PM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order signed on 1/12/2018. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on 5/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
6 6 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/05 4:21 PM
Order Signed on 1/5/2018 Granting Application of Donna L. Thompson, Esq. for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Related [+] . (Li, Dorothy)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
5 5 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Wed 12/27 3:44 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Donna L. Thompson on behalf of PORKY PRODUCTS, INC.. (Thompson, Donna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 proposed form of order
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 12/27 3:45 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-08291 rdd) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12356936. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #5
Sunday, October 29, 2017
4 4 answer None Sun 10/29 12:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Donna L. Thompson on behalf of PORKY PRODUCTS, INC..(Thompson, Donna)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Pleading certificate of service
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/24 1:12 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Complaint Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Thursday, October 19, 2017
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 10/19 11:26 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 11/20/2017. (Harris, A'Shalanique)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 10/18 10:04 AM
Adversary case 17-08291 Complaint against PORKY PRODUCTS, INC. (Fee Amount $ 350.) Related [+]. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Foods, Inc. II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] ceipt Number Deferred.