Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00037
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Terminated:Sep 14, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
LONNIE ANDERSON
2000 11th ST. SW
GREAT FALLS, MT 59404
Represented By
LONNIE ANDERSON
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, August 08, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 4:13 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 16, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Sun 09/16 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Friday, September 14, 2018
14 14 order Dismissing Proceedings Fri 09/14 3:21 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings Signed on 9/14/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time,13 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
13 13 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/14 1:35 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 09/14 3:22 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-37 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 25, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 05/25 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/25/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
11 11 order Extend Time Wed 05/23 11:27 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DEFENDANT LONNIE ANDERSON'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 08/31/18 Related [+] Signed on 5/23/2018. Document due by 8/31/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, May 21, 2018
10 10 motion Extend Time Mon 05/21 2:34 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 01/24 7:08 AM
LONNIE ANDERSON Answer Deadline Reset for 2/19/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2017
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 12/26 9:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on LONNIE ANDERSON 12/19/2017 Waiver of Service . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/13 2:29 PM
Summons Service Executed on LONNIE ANDERSON 12/13/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Summons Issued Wed 12/13 1:59 PM
Summons REISSUED on LONNIE ANDERSON Date Issued 12/13/2017, Answer Due 1/12/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 19, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Sun 11/19 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)5 Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal
Friday, November 17, 2017
5 5 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Fri 11/17 9:36 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/1/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on LONNIE ANDERSON 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 10/17 3:17 PM
Summons Issued on Lonnie Anderson Date Issued 10/17/2017, Answer Due 11/16/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/17 3:13 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2310582 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00037 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/17 3:11 PM
Adversary case 17-00037 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against Lonnie Anderson. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary of Transfers
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons