Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00038
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Terminated:Jan 17, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
TOM SIDOR
11 WOODLAND ESTATES ROAD
GREAT FALLS, MT 57404
Represented By
TOM SIDOR
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, January 17, 2020
30 30 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Fri 01/17 8:18 AM
Order Dismissing Proceedings with Prejudice Signed on 1/17/2020 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)23 Order Setting Trial,29 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/17 8:20 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-38 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
29 29 misc Stipulation - Attorney Event Wed 01/15 12:25 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Tom Sidor Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2019
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Sun 11/10 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)27 Order Approving Stipulation
Friday, November 08, 2019
27 27 order Approving Stipulation Fri 11/08 4:12 PM
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation to Amend Complaint, Doc. No. 25, is APPROVED. Defendant has 30 days from the filing of the Amended Complaint to file his Answer. All remaining deadlines in the scheduling order, Doc. No. 23, stand. Signed on 11/8/2019 Related [+]. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)25 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/08 1:26 PM
Amended Complaint by KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against TOM SIDOR.. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Exhibit
25 25 misc Stipulation - Attorney Event Fri 11/08 11:30 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Tom Sidor Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2019
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial Thu 10/24 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/24/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)23 Order Setting Trial
Tuesday, October 22, 2019
23 23 2 pgs order Order Setting Trial Tue 10/22 3:44 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 10/22/2019 Related [+]. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Disclosure of Experts due by 3/13/2020. Experts Written Reports due by 3/13/2020. Amendments to Pleadings or to Join Additional Parties due by 11/8/2019. Any and all dispositive motions must be filed on or before 06/08/2020. The parties shall participate in voluntary mediation to be held in a location to be determined, on or before 07/13/2020. Upon the close of discovery either party may or the Parties shall request a Pretrial conference with the Court. The request for a Pretrial Conference shall be made by 06/08/2020 (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)21 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
22 22 court Minutes of Hearing Held - ADV Tue 10/22 9:57 AM
Minutes of Hearing Held;Mr Ryan updated court as to the status of this case, scheduling Order to be approved Appearances by: Kyle Ryan Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)18 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, October 17, 2019
21 21 misc Stipulation - Attorney Event Thu 10/17 12:52 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Tom Sidor Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
20 20 misc Report to Court - Attorney Event Tue 10/15 4:14 PM
Report to Court Regarding Case Status Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 06, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Sun 10/06 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)18 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, October 04, 2019
18 18 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Fri 10/04 2:46 PM
Order Setting Status Hearing Signed on 10/4/2019 Related [+]. HEARING scheduled for 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER,16 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant TOM SIDOR
Thursday, August 08, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:37 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/10 3:07 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by TOM SIDOR. (DUBOIS, NEAL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 11, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 03/11 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, March 09, 2018
14 14 order Extend Time Fri 03/09 11:26 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DEFENDANT HAS THROUGH 04/06/18 TO ANSWSER PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT Related [+] Signed on 3/9/2018. Document due by 4/6/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 13 (s)10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 03/09 11:27 AM
TOM SIDOR Answer Deadline Reset for 4/6/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 08, 2018
13 13 motion Extend Time Thu 03/08 10:15 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendant TOM SIDOR. (DUBOIS, NEAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 01/31 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)10 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 01/30 5:13 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
10 10 order Extend Time Mon 01/29 5:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time TO FEBRUARY 23, 2018 FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAITIFF'S COMPLAINT. Related [+] Signed on 1/29/2018. Document due by 2/23/2018. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] 9
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 01/29 5:19 PM
TOM SIDOR Answer Deadline Reset for 2/23/2018. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2018
9 9 motion Extend Time Fri 01/26 3:35 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Filed by Defendant TOM SIDOR. (DUBOIS, NEAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/07 7:09 AM
TOM SIDOR Answer Deadline Reset for 2/5/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/06 4:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on TOM SIDOR 11/22/2017 Waiver of Service . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
7 7 court Summons Issued Wed 11/22 1:07 PM
Summons REIssued on TOM SIDOR Date Issued 11/22/2017, Answer Due 12/22/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 19, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Sun 11/19 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/19/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)5 Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal
Friday, November 17, 2017
5 5 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Fri 11/17 9:38 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/1/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 3:03 PM
Summons Service Executed on TOM SIDOR 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 10/17 3:32 PM
Summons Issued on TOM SIDOR Date Issued 10/17/2017, Answer Due 11/16/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/17 3:26 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2310595 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00038 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/17 3:25 PM
Adversary case 17-00038 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against TOM SIDOR. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary of Transfers
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons