Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00039
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Terminated:Aug 20, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
MICHAEL DUBE
1401 25th ST SOUTH NO. 2
GREAT FALLS, MT 59405
Represented By
MICHAEL DUBE
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, August 08, 2019
21 21 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 4:31 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Wed 08/22 10:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)19 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Monday, August 20, 2018
19 19 order Dismissing Proceedings Mon 08/20 1:16 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings WITH PREJUDICE, EACH SIDE TO PAY ITS OWN FEES AND COSTS Signed on 8/20/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/20 1:17 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-39 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 08/17 11:24 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Steven M. Johnson Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2018
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Thu 03/01 11:02 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/01/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)15 Order Approving Stipulation
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Wed 02/28 11:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 02/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order Approving Stipulation
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
15 15 order Approving Stipulation Tue 02/27 9:53 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT, AND THE TIME IN WHICH DEFENDANT MICHEAL DUBE MUST ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS CONTINUED INDEFINITELY PENDING THE COMPLETION OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS Signed on 2/27/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)13 Stipulation filed by Defendant MICHAEL DUBE
Monday, February 26, 2018
14 14 order Approving Stipulation Mon 02/26 5:02 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND THE TIME IN WHICH DEFENDANT MICHAEL DUBE MUST ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS CONTINUED INDEFINITELY PENDING THE COMPLETION OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS Signed on 2/26/2018 Related [+]. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)13 Stipulation filed by Defendant MICHAEL DUBE
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 02/26 12:16 PM
Stipulation By MICHAEL DUBE and Plaintiff to Continue Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's First Discovery Requests Filed by MICHAEL DUBE Related [+]. (JOHNSON, STEVEN)
Related: [-] (s)11 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Monday, February 12, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/12 11:20 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by MICHAEL DUBE. (JOHNSON, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 01/30 5:14 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/29 4:44 PM
Amended Complaint by DAVID B COTNER on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against MICHAEL DUBE. Related [+]. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Att: 1 Exhibit
Monday, January 08, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/08 11:27 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by MICHAEL DUBE. (JOHNSON, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/14 7:23 AM
MICHAEL DUBE Answer Deadline Reset for 1/11/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
8 8 misc Withdrawal of Document Tue 11/14 11:57 AM
Withdrawal of Document Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by MICHAEL DUBE Related [+]. (JOHNSON, STEVEN)
Related: [-] (s)5 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant MICHAEL DUBE
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/14 11:10 AM
i>Waiver of Service of Summons. (JOHNSON, STEVEN) Modified on 11/14/2017 TO DELETE THE RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED LANGUAGE (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
6 6 court Summons Issued Mon 11/13 10:01 AM
Summons REISSUED on MICHAEL DUBE Date Issued 11/13/2017, Answer Due 12/13/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2017
5 5 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/10 12:52 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by MICHAEL DUBE. Objection Due by 11/24/2017. (JOHNSON, STEVEN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 3:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on MICHAEL DUBE 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 10/17 3:40 PM
Summons Issued on Michael Dube Date Issued 10/17/2017, Answer Due 11/16/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/17 3:30 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2310611 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00039 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/17 3:30 PM
Adversary case 17-00039 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against Michael Dube. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary of Transfers
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons