Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00042
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Terminated:Nov 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC
30 BROAD ST 14th FLOOR SUITE 14108
NEW YORK, NY 10004
Represented By
HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/12 2:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-42 Closed. (mmp)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2019
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Sun 11/10 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 11/10/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)38 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Friday, November 08, 2019
38 38 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Fri 11/08 2:50 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings. This adversary proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 11/8/2019 Related [+]. (mmp)
Related: [-] (s)37 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Thursday, November 07, 2019
37 37 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/07 4:26 PM
Agreed Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
36 36 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:20 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
35 35 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 06/14 3:27 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney ERIC RYAN HENKEL removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 06, 2019
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 01/06 10:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)33 Order on Motion to Extend Time - ADV
Friday, January 04, 2019
33 33 order Extend Time Fri 01/04 12:02 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 03/15/19 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2019. Document due by 3/15/2019.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 32 (s)30 Order on Motion to Extend Time - ADV
Friday, December 28, 2018
32 32 motion Motion to Extend Time - ADV Fri 12/28 11:06 AM
Joint Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 19, 2018
31 31 misc Withdrawal of Document - Attorney Event Mon 11/19 9:30 AM
Withdrawal of Document Motion for Summary Judgment on Count One Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC Related [+]. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-] (s)23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC
Thursday, October 04, 2018
30 30 order Extend Time Fri 10/05 8:05 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND HIGH SPEED CAPITASL LLC AND THE TRUSTEE SHALL HAVE UNTIL 01/15/19 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 10/4/2018. Document due by 1/15/2019. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 28
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
29 29 court Generic Notice Wed 09/26 12:47 PM
Notice OF MAIL RETURN FOR HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC MARKED AS UNDELIVERABLE RECEIVED FROM THE BNC. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
28 28 motion Extend Time Mon 09/24 10:49 AM
Joint Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 15, 2018
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Sat 09/15 10:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)26 Order Approving Stipulation
Thursday, September 13, 2018
26 26 order Approving Stipulation Thu 09/13 4:46 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between JEREMIAH FOSTER AND HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC AND THE PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE 14 DAYS AFTER THE PARTIES RECEIVE THE TRANSCRIPT OF THE DEPOSITION OF KENNETH HATZENBELLER TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION AND MEMORANDUM FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DKT 23) Signed on 9/13/2018 Related [+]. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)25 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
25 25 misc Stipulation Tue 09/11 9:32 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and HIGH SPEED CAPITAL, LLC Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-] (s)23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC
24 24 misc Stipulation Tue 09/11 9:00 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and High Speed Capital, LLC Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-] (s)23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC
court Entered in Error Tue 09/11 9:34 AM
Entered in Error Related [+]. WRONG PDF ATTACHED FILER CORRECTED AT DKT 25 (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)24 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Tue 08/28 3:36 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment ON COUNT ONE - CHOICE OF LAW Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. Objection Due by 09/11/2018. (JAMES, DOUG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. April 27, 2015 Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. July 21, 2015 Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. June 11, 2015 Agreement
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 07/18 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)21 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, July 16, 2018
21 21 order Extend Time Mon 07/16 2:47 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND THE PARTIES SHALL HVE UNTIL 11/16/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 7/16/2018. Document due by 11/16/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 20 (s)18 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, July 13, 2018
20 20 motion Extend Time Fri 07/13 1:38 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 05/18 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)18 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
18 18 order Extend Time Wed 05/16 3:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC SHALL HAVE UNTIL 07/25/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FOSTERS FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND UNTIL 08/29/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FOSTERS SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS. FOSTER SHALL HAVE UNTIL 07/25/18 TO RESPOND TO HIGH SPEED CAPITAL DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 5/16/2018. Document due by 7/25/2018. (Mahoney, Patti) Modified on 5/16/2018 (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 17
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
17 17 motion Extend Time Tue 05/15 11:22 AM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Fri 04/27 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)15 Order Approving Stipulation
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
15 15 order Approving Stipulation Wed 04/25 10:33 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC SHALL HAVE UNTIL 06/29/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FOSTERS SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS Signed on 4/25/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)14 Stipulation filed by Defendant HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC
Monday, April 23, 2018
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 04/23 4:07 PM
Stipulation By HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC and Jeremiah Foster Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC Related [+]. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-] (s)13 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Thursday, April 05, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 04/05 2:08 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
12 12 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 01/30 4:58 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
11 11 misc Notice Thu 01/18 2:45 PM
Notice OF CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO BANKRUPTCY RULE 7007.1 Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (JAMES, DOUG)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/18 2:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (JAMES, DOUG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 12/07 11:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/07/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)8 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
8 8 order Extend Time Tue 12/05 4:02 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DEFENDANT IS GRATNED UP TO AND INCLUDING 01/19/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND Related [+] Signed on 12/5/2017. Document due by 1/19/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 7
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 12/05 4:02 PM
HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 1/19/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
7 7 motion Extend Time Mon 12/04 2:17 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER Filed by HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/21 10:06 AM
Summons Service Executed on HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC 11/21/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 11/15 12:52 PM
Summons REISSUED on HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 10:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on HIGH SPEED CAPITAL LLC 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 10/18 7:43 AM
Summons Issued on High Speed Capital LLC Date Issued 10/18/2017, Answer Due 11/17/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 10/17 5:27 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2310699 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00042 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/17 5:27 PM
Adversary case 17-00042 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against High Speed Capital LLC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contract
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons