Breecker v. Sanofi S.A. et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-10819 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 16, 2018 4:58 AM CDT |
Defendant
Accord Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Aventis Pharma S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi S.A.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharma Global FZE
|
|
Defendant
Hospira Worldwide, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi US Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Winthrop U.S.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Marnie Breecker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/16 2:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (Filed at Rec. Doc. 13591 as Minute Entry)(ecm) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 05/22 1:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Mon 11/06 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.. (Payton, Paige) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Request for Summons Issued
Fri 11/03 10:11 AM
Request of Summons Issued as to Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. filed by Marnie Breecker re1 Complaint,,,.(McGartland, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 10/23 9:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Accord Healthcare, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Hospira Worldwide, LLC, Hospira, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (cc) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
30+
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Fri 10/20 4:29 PM
PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Wed 10/18 4:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 10/18 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Accord Healthcare, Inc., Aventis Pharma S.A., Hospira Worldwide, LLC f/k/a Hospira Worldwide, Inc., Hospira, Inc., Sandoz Inc., Sanofi S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately, and doing business as Winthrop U.S., Sun Pharma Global FZE, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. f/k/a Caraco Pharamceutical Laboratories Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6422532) filed by Marnie Breecker.Attorney Michael P. McGartland added to party Marnie Breecker(pty:pla).(McGartland, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons |