Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food St v. SALEM TRUCK LEASING, INC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-23535
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-23535
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-ap-08317 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
SALEM TRUCK LEASING, INC.
9505 Avenue D
Brooklyn, NY 11236 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II
Rich Michaelson Magaliff Moser, LLP 335 Madison Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:08 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 06/19 3:00 PM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8317 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Stipulation : Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order signed on 5/17/2018 Authorizing Entry Into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (A) Jetro Cash And Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, Jrd Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, Jrd Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry And Jetro Cash & Carry; (B) Porky Products, Inc.; (C) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; And (D) Fairmont Foods, Inc. . (Rai, Narotam) |
|
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/17 4:10 PM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8317 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rai, Narotam) |
||
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 : Certificate of No Objection of Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Affidavit of Service : Affidavit of Service of Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry Into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Motion to Approve : Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Presentment Date: May 14, 2018 at 12:00 Noon (EST). Objection Deadline: May 14, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. (EST) filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order signed on 1/12/2018. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on 5/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Rai, Narotam) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Affidavit of Service Answer and Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Richard G. Gertler on behalf of SALEM TRUCK LEASING, INC.. (Gertler, Richard) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Answer to Complaint filed by Richard G. Gertler on behalf of SALEM TRUCK LEASING, INC..(Gertler, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Complaint Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 11/20/2017. (Harris, A'Shalanique) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-08317 Complaint against SALEM TRUCK LEASING, INC. (Fee Amount $ 350.) . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Foods, Inc. II. (Traurig, Jeffrey) |