Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00044
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2017
Terminated:May 28, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
LOIS HATZENBELLER
1626 LAURENS WAY SW
ATLANTA, GA 30311
Represented By
LOIS HATZENBELLER
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, August 08, 2019
41 41 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:05 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
40 40 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Thu 05/30 11:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/30/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)39 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
39 39 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Tue 05/28 2:39 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings WITH PREJUDICE Signed on 5/28/2019 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)38 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
38 38 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Tue 05/28 11:28 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/28 2:40 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-44 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 25, 2019
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic) Sat 05/25 10:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/25/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)36 Order (Generic)
Thursday, May 23, 2019
36 36 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 05/23 10:47 AM
Order that Plaintiff shall have 7 days to file a statement as to why this adversary proceeding should not be dismissed based on the approved settlement. If nothing is filed in 7 days, the Court will dismiss the adversary proceeding withprejudice. Signed on 5/23/2019. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
35 35 misc Brief Wed 09/26 10:57 AM
Amended Brief Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-] (s)31 Generic Motion filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
34 34 misc Brief Tue 09/25 3:29 PM
Opposition Brief Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-] (s)31 Generic Motion filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER
33 33 motion Dismiss/Withdraw Document Tue 09/25 3:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-] (s)32 Response filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
32 32 answer Response Tue 09/25 2:21 PM
Response Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-] (s)31 Generic Motion filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
31 31 motion Generic Motion Tue 09/11 3:48 PM
Motion TO VACATE SCHEDULING ORDER AND COMPEL ENFORCEMENT OF SETTLEMENT Filed by LOIS HATZENBELLER. Objection Due by 9/25/2018. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email acceptance of settlement
Friday, July 27, 2018
30 30 motion Generic Motion Fri 07/27 12:36 PM
Joint Motion for Pretrial Conference Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Fri 03/30 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)28 Order Approving Stipulation
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
28 28 order Approving Stipulation Wed 03/28 2:49 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND THE PARTIES STIPULATED SCHEDULING ORDER IS APPROVED Signed on 3/28/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)27 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
27 27 misc Stipulation Wed 03/28 10:49 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Lois Hatzenbeller Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 10, 2018
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Sat 03/10 12:36 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by LOIS HATZENBELLER. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2018
25 25 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/15 2:09 PM
Amended Complaint by KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against LOIS HATZENBELLER.. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, February 08, 2018
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Amend Thu 02/08 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Amend. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)23 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, February 05, 2018
23 23 order Amend Tue 02/06 6:47 AM
Order GRANTING NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding AND THE HEARING ON THAT MOTION IS VACATED Related [+], Granting Motion To Amend FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND PLAINTIFF SHALL IMMEDIATELY FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ANY ATTACHMENTS THERETO UNDER ITS OWN SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY Signed on 2/5/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 9 19 (s)17 Reply/Response (Hearing Required) filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER,19 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
22 22 notice Notice Mon 02/05 12:13 PM
Notice of: 1) WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO DISMISS; 2) CONSENT TO GRANT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND; 3) INTENT NOT TO PURSUE MOTION TO DISMISS Filed by LOIS HATZENBELLER Related [+]. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-] (s)9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER,17 Reply/Response (Hearing Required) filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER,19 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER,21 Response filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER
21 21 answer Response Mon 02/05 12:11 PM
Response Filed by LOIS HATZENBELLER Related [+]. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-] (s)19 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 01/30 5:00 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
19 19 motion Amend Mon 01/22 11:23 AM
Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. Objection Due by 02/5/2018. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
18 18 order Extend Time Thu 01/18 7:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 01/19/18 Related [+] Signed on 1/17/2018. Document due by 1/19/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 16
17 17 answer Reply/Response (Hearing Required) Wed 01/17 2:43 PM
Reply/Response - HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS scheduled for 2/22/2018 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-] (s)9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER
Monday, January 15, 2018
16 16 motion Extend Time Mon 01/15 2:49 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 01/11 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
14 14 order Extend Time Tue 01/09 3:34 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS9 IS DUE ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 15, 2018. Related [+] Signed on 1/9/2018. Document due by 1/15/2018.. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] 13 (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
13 13 motion Extend Time Tue 01/09 9:18 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 06, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 01/06 10:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, January 04, 2018
11 11 order Extend Time Thu 01/04 2:44 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time; PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 01/09/18. Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2018. Document due by 1/9/2018.. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-] 10 (s)9 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant LOIS HATZENBELLER
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
10 10 motion Extend Time Wed 01/03 2:51 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
9 9 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/22 4:26 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by LOIS HATZENBELLER. Objection Due by 1/5/2018. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Thu 12/21 10:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)7 Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
7 7 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Tue 12/19 8:35 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 1/2/2018. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/21 9:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on LOIS HATZENBELLER 11/21/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 11/15 2:04 PM
Summons REISSUED on LOIS HATZENBELLER Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 11/06 4:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on LOIS HATZENBELLER 11/6/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 10/18 3:27 PM
Summons Issued on LOIS HATZENBELLER Date Issued 10/18/2017, Answer Due 11/17/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 10/18 2:04 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2310972 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00044 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 2:03 PM
Adversary case 17-00044 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against LOIS HATZENBELLER. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit PROMISSORY NOTE
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-yr Payment Schedule
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 -Year Payments
Att: 4 Cover Sheet
Att: 5 Summons