Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00045
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2017
Terminated:Oct 03, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.
Represented By
WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Represented By
DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Wed 10/05 10:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/05/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Monday, October 03, 2022
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Mon 10/03 3:09 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings Signed on 10/3/2022 Related [+]. (JFW)
Related: [-] 38 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Mon 10/03 3:10 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-45 Closed. (JFW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
40 40 audio Digital Audio Tue 09/13 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/13/2022 2:31:17 PM ]. File Size [ 5280 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:00 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (AdminMontana)
Related: [-]
39 39 court Minutes of Hearing Held Tue 09/13 3:31 PM
Minutes of Hearing Held; Appearances by: Kyle Ryan, Jeremiah Foster and Nicole Manos.Status update given by counsel for Trustee. Hearing held in conjunction with cases BK 15-60979 AP 17-0028 and AP 17-0043 Hearing commenced at 02:31 and concluded at 02:43 Related [+]. (KJL)
Related: [-] 35 Order Setting Hearing
38 38 motion Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/13 3:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
37 37 notice Notice - ADV Fri 09/09 3:33 PM
Notice of Status Report Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Wed 08/31 10:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 9. Notice Date 08/31/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, August 29, 2022
35 35 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Mon 08/29 3:19 PM
Order Setting Status Conference Hearing Signed on 8/16/2022 Related [+]. STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled for 9/13/2022 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing . (JFW)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Sunday, July 26, 2020
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic) Sun 07/26 10:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)33 Order Reassigning Case
Friday, July 24, 2020
33 33 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 07/24 3:30 PM
Order Reassigning Case to Judge Whitman L. Holt. Involvement of Judge TERRY L MYERS Terminated Signed on 7/24/2020. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 01, 2019
32 32 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Sun 12/01 4:00 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney JAMES H. COSSITT removed from the case. Filed by WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EM to client of intent to withdraw and terminate representation
Thursday, August 08, 2019
31 31 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:42 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
30 30 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 06/14 3:28 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney ERIC RYAN HENKEL removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic) Fri 05/18 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)28 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
28 28 1 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 05/16 11:22 AM
Order THAT THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING IS STAYED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT Signed on 5/16/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)27 Notice filed by Defendant WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
27 27 notice Notice Wed 05/09 4:57 PM
Notice OF CHAPTER 11 FILING IN SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA Filed by WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Chapter 11 petition, SD Florida
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
26 26 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/08 11:57 AM
Amended Complaint by KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC... (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Merger MT
Att: 2 Exhibit Merger STM 4
Att: 3 Exhibit STM 22
Att: 4 Exhibit Merger of WA
Att: 5 Exhibit Merger of ID
Att: 6 Exhibit STM MT
Att: 7 Exhibit STM 4
Att: 8 Exhibit STM 22
Att: 9 Exhibit STM WA
Att: 10 Exhibit Contract
Att: 11 Exhibit Contract
Att: 12 Exhibit Contract
Att: 13 Exhibit Contract
Att: 14 Exhibit Contract
Att: 15 Exhibit Schedule of Payments
Att: 16 Exhibit Schedule of Payments
Att: 17 Exhibit Schedule of Payments
Friday, April 27, 2018
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Amend Fri 04/27 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Amend. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)24 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
24 24 order Amend Wed 04/25 2:26 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding AND MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Related [+], Granting Motion To Amend AND PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 20 DAYS OF THE 04/19/18 HEARING Signed on 4/25/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 8 17
Friday, April 20, 2018
23 23 audio Digital Audio Fri 04/20 12:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/19/2018 1:35:41 AM ]. File Size [ 4732 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:19:43 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
22 22 court Minutes of Hearing Held Thu 04/19 1:55 PM
Minutes of Hearing Held; MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED; MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED AND THE PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THE NEXT 20 DAYS; PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT A PROPOSED ORDER IN CONFORMITY WITH THE COURTS VERBAL RULING Appearances by: KYLE RYAN AND JAMES A COSSITT Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)19 Notice of Hearing
Saturday, April 07, 2018
21 21 court BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Sat 04/07 10:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)19 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, April 05, 2018
20 20 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 04/05 2:27 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Notice of Hearing Thu 04/05 12:14 PM
Notice of Hearing ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT, HEARING BEING MOVED TO 01:30PM . MOTION HEARING scheduled for 4/19/2018 at 01:30 PM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
18 18 answer Reply/Response (Hearing Required) Thu 03/15 12:41 PM
Reply/Response - MOTION HEARING scheduled for 4/19/2018 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . Filed by WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC. Related [+]. Motion Hearing scheduled for 4/19/2018 at 09:30 AM GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-] (s)17 Motion to Amend filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
17 17 motion Amend Wed 02/28 5:50 PM
Motion to Amend Complaint Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. Objection Due by 03/14/2018. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
16 16 answer Reply/Response (Hearing Required) Wed 02/28 5:48 PM
Reply/Response - HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS scheduled for 4/19/2018 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-] (s)8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC., Generic Motion
Saturday, February 17, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 02/17 10:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/17/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, February 15, 2018
14 14 order Extend Time Thu 02/15 8:38 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS Related [+] Signed on 2/15/2018. Document due by 2/28/2018.
Related: [-] 13 (s)8 11 (Mahoney, Patti
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
13 13 motion Extend Time Wed 02/14 4:46 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 02/08 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, February 05, 2018
11 11 order Extend Time Tue 02/06 6:49 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS IS DUE ON OR BEFORE 02/14/18 Related [+] Signed on 2/5/2018. Document due by 2/14/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 9 (s)8 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
10 10 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 01/30 5:01 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
9 9 motion Extend Time Mon 01/29 4:47 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Dismiss Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
8 8 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 01/17 6:49 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding , or in the alternative Motion For More Definite Statement Filed by WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC.. Objection Due by 1/31/2018. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 12/06 7:25 AM
WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC. Answer Deadline Reset for 1/18/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
7 7 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Mon 11/27 7:52 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/11/2017. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
6 6 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Mon 11/27 7:37 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/11/2017. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Sunday, November 19, 2017
5 5 notice Notice Sun 11/19 8:26 PM
Notice OF FILING OF WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS / Filed by WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC. Related [+]. (COSSITT, JAMES)
Related: [-] (s) 3 Summons Issued,4 Summons Service Executed
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 10:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC. 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 10/18 3:43 PM
Summons Issued on DOES 1-10 Date Issued 10/18/2017, Answer Due 11/17/2017; WORLD GLOBAL FINANCING, INC. Date Issued 10/18/2017, Answer Due 11/17/2017. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 10/18 2:25 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2310988 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00045 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 2:24 PM
Adversary case 17-00045 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against World Global Financing, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contracts
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons