Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00048
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2017
Terminated:Nov 12, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
WEBBANK
215 SOUTH STATE STREET, STE. 1000
SALT LAKE CITY, UT 84111
Represented By
WEBBANK
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Represented By
JOHN DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, November 14, 2019
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Thu 11/14 11:05 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/14/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)24 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Tuesday, November 12, 2019
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Tue 11/12 9:46 AM
Order Dismissing Proceedings With Prejudice. Each side shall pay its own fees and costs. Signed on 11/12/2019 Related [+]. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)23 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/12 10:28 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-48 Closed. (mmp)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2019
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/08 11:22 AM
Agreed Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 13, 2019
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate Sun 10/13 10:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 10/13/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)21 Order Vacating Order
Friday, October 11, 2019
21 21 order Vacating Order Fri 10/11 3:09 PM
Order Vacating Order setting status hearing October 22, 2019. Signed on 10/11/2019 Related [+]20 Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)18 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
20 20 notice Notice - ADV Wed 10/09 12:08 PM
Notice of Settlement Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 06, 2019
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing Sun 10/06 10:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)18 Order Setting Hearing
Friday, October 04, 2019
18 18 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Fri 10/04 2:48 PM
Order Setting Status Hearing Signed on 10/4/2019 Related [+]. HEARING scheduled for 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER,14 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant WEBBANK
Thursday, August 08, 2019
17 17 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:39 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 06/14 3:30 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney ERIC RYAN HENKEL removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 04/05 2:25 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2018
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/16 12:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by WEBBANK. (MCKELVEY, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 01/30 5:03 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 14, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Sun 01/14 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/14/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order Approving Stipulation
Friday, January 12, 2018
11 11 order Approving Stipulation Fri 01/12 4:11 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 02/16/18 Signed on 1/12/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 01/12 4:12 PM
WEBBANK Answer Deadline Reset for 2/16/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
10 10 misc Stipulation Wed 01/10 1:45 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and WebBank Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
9 9 order Approving Stipulation Tue 12/05 3:48 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 01/15/18 Signed on 12/5/2017 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)8 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
8 8 misc Stipulation Tue 12/05 8:20 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and WebBank Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 12/05 3:49 PM
WEBBANK Answer Deadline Reset for 1/15/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 12/04 5:37 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and WebBank Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/21 9:58 AM
Summons Service Executed on WEBBANK 11/21/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 11/15 1:01 PM
Summons REISSUED on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017; WEBBANK Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 10:42 AM
Summons Service Executed on WEBBANK 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/19 7:28 AM
Summons Issued on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017; WEBBANK Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 10/18 4:48 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311108 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00048 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 10/18 4:47 PM
Adversary case 17-00048 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against WEBBANK, JOHN DOES 1-10. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contracts
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons