Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00053
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2017
Terminated:Jun 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC
Sprechman & Fisher, PA 2775 Sunny Isles Blvd. Ste. 100
Miami, FL 33160
Represented By
MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Represented By
JOHN DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, June 05, 2020
57 57 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Fri 06/05 10:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/05/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)56 Order Approving Stipulation
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
56 56 order Approving Stipulation Wed 06/03 9:20 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between Plaintiff and Defendant; and this Adversary Proceeding is dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their respective cost and fees. Signed on 6/3/2020 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)44 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant MERCHANT CAPITAL GROUP, LLC,54 Order on Motion to Extend Time - ADV,55 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/03 9:21 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-53 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 29, 2020
55 55 misc Stipulation - Attorney Event Fri 05/29 3:16 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Merchant Capital Group, LLC Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]