FOSTER v. LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979
Montana Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Terry L Myers |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-00054 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Oct 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 22, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC.
PO BOX 728
VALLEY STREAM, NY 11582 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Friday, July 24, 2020 | ||
40 | 40
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/24/2020. (Admin.) |
|
39 | 39
![]() Order Reassigning Case to Judge Whitman L. Holt. Involvement of Judge TERRY L MYERS Terminated Signed on 7/24/2020. (Mahoney, Patti) |
|
Wednesday, July 22, 2020 | ||
38 | 38
![]() Order Approving Stipulation By & Between the parties; this Adversary Proceeding is dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 7/22/2020 . (mmp) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 07/22 10:06 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-54 Closed. (mmp) |
||
Tuesday, July 21, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC..(RHOADES, QUENTIN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 08, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Notice of Settlement Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE) |
|
Friday, January 31, 2020 | ||
35 | 35
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/31/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, January 29, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Order Granting Motion to Extend Time and parties have until February 12, 2020, to exchange the Expert Witness Disclosures. Signed on 1/29/2020. Document due by 2/12/2020. (Cunningham, Pamela) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Agreed Motion to Extend Time Regarding Expert Disclosures Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
![]() Order Approving Stipulation By & Between Plaintiff and Defendant. The parties have until 01/29/20 to exchange the Expert Witness Disclosures Signed on 12/19/2019 . (Mahoney, Patti) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
![]() Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Last Chance Funding, Inc. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC.. (RHOADES, QUENTIN) |
|
Saturday, November 02, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Amended Complaint by KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC... (RYAN, KYLE) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
27 | 27
![]() Order Approving Stipulation By & Between Plaintiff and Defendant, Defendant has 30 days from the filing of the Amended Complaint to file its answer, all remaining deadlines in the scheduling order stand Signed on 10/31/201926 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER). (Mahoney, Patti) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Last Chance Funding, Inc. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Trial. . No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order to Vacate. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/17/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Order Vacating the October 22, 2019 Status Hearing in this proceeding. Signed on 10/15/2019 . (Grady, Colleen) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Order GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SCHEDULING ORDER Signed on 10/15/2019 . Discovery due by 3/16/2020. Responses to outstanding discovery requests shall be completed on or before 11/15/19. Discovery papers shall be served so that any responses are due on or before 2/14/20. Experts Written Reports due by 1/15/2020. Amendments to Pleadings or to Join Additional Parties due by 10/31/2019. Any and all dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2020. Mediation or Settlement Conference Completed by 5/15/2020. Pre-Trial Order, List of Witnesses & List of Exhibits due by 4/8/2020. Requests for a Pretrial Conference shall be made by April 8, 2020. (Grady, Colleen) Modified on 10/16/2019 to correct a date 2/14/19 to 2/14/20. (mmp) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Report to Court Regarding Case Status Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID) |
|
Monday, October 14, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and Last Chance Funding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID) |
|
Sunday, October 06, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/06/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Order Setting Status Hearing Signed on 10/4/2019 . HEARING scheduled for 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . (Mahoney, Patti) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT) |
|
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney ERIC RYAN HENKEL removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC.. (RHOADES, QUENTIN) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE) |
|
Saturday, January 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/27/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 02/05/18 Signed on 1/25/2018 . (Mahoney, Patti) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Thu 01/25 1:40 PM
LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. Answer Deadline Reset for 2/5/2018. (Mahoney, Patti) |
||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Stipulation By LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. and Plaintiff Filed by LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC.. (RHOADES, QUENTIN) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice.. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/21/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal. (Palmer, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Summons Service Executed on LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. 11/22/2017 Waiver of Service . (COTNER, DAVID) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Wed 11/15 1:00 PM
Summons REISSUED on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017; LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017. (Mahoney, Patti) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed on LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 10/19 10:14 AM
Summons Issued on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued
Thu 10/19 9:16 AM
Summons Issued on LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC. Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Thu 10/19 9:11 AM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311308 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00054 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 17-00054 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against LAST CHANCE FUNDING, INC.. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |