Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00055
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2017
Terminated:May 22, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
NEW ERA LENDING, LLC
AMERICHOICE INCORPORATORS, LTD 1201 N. ORANGE ST. STE. 762 ONE COMMERCE CENTER
WILMINGTON, DE 19801
Represented By
NEW ERA LENDING, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Represented By
JOHN DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, May 12, 2020
28 28 notice Notice - ADV Tue 05/12 12:38 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Conflict and Request to Reschedule Hearing Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
court Entered in Error - ADV Tue 05/12 12:54 PM
Entered in Error Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)28 Generic Notice filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Thursday, August 08, 2019
27 27 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:29 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Thu 05/23 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/23/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)25 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Wed 05/22 6:45 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-55 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
25 25 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Tue 05/21 5:03 PM
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE IS APPROVED Signed on 5/21/2019 Related [+]. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)24 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Thursday, December 20, 2018
24 24 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 12/20 10:51 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
23 23 court Generic Notice Mon 07/16 3:52 PM
Notice OF MAIL RETURN FOR CAREY TOMPKINS RECEIVED FROM THE BNC AS UNDELIVERABLE (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 07/09 7:38 AM
NEW ERA LENDING, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 8/31/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 07, 2018
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Sat 07/07 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 07/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)21 Order Approving Stipulation
Thursday, July 05, 2018
21 21 order Approving Stipulation Thu 07/05 2:35 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between JEREMIAH J FOSTER AND NEW ERA LENDING LLC. DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING FRIDAY, AUGUST 31, 2018 Signed on 7/5/2018 Related [+]. (HANSON, COLIN)
Related: [-] (s)20 Motion to Extend Time filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Monday, July 02, 2018
20 20 motion Extend Time Mon 07/02 2:55 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 29, 2018
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 04/29 10:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/29/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)18 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, April 27, 2018
18 18 order Extend Time Fri 04/27 4:13 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND NEW ERA LENDING LLC'S ANSWER IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING FRIDAY, JUNE 29, 2018. Related [+] Signed on 4/27/2018. Document due by 6/29/2018. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] 17
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 04/27 4:14 PM
NEW ERA LENDING, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 6/29/2018. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
17 17 motion Extend Time Thu 04/26 5:02 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 05, 2018
16 16 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 04/05 2:14 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Wed 02/14 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/14/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order Approving Stipulation
Monday, February 12, 2018
14 14 order Approving Stipulation Mon 02/12 11:50 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND IS EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 03/26/18 Signed on 2/12/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s) Update Objection/Response Deadline,13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 02/12 8:56 AM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and New Era Lending, LLC Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 02/12 11:51 AM
NEW ERA LENDING, LLC Answer Deadline Reset for 3/26/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 06, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Sat 01/06 10:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order Approving Stipulation
Thursday, January 04, 2018
11 11 order Approving Stipulation Thu 01/04 2:55 PM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between THE PARTIES; DEFENDANT NEW ERA LENDING, LLC'S TIM TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO 02/23/18. Signed on 1/4/2018 Related [+]. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-] (s)10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 01/04 12:33 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and New Era Lending, LLC to Extend Time to file Answer Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Thu 12/21 10:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice.. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/21/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
8 8 court Generic Notice Tue 12/19 12:56 PM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal. DOCUMENT DUE 1/2/18. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/21 9:56 AM
Summons Service Executed on NEW ERA LENDING, LLC 11/21/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
6 6 court Summons Issued Wed 11/15 12:57 PM
Summons REISSUED on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017; NEW ERA LENDING, LLC Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 10:47 AM
Summons Service Executed on NEW ERA LENDING, LLC 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued Thu 10/19 10:15 AM
Summons Issued on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/19 9:30 AM
Summons Issued on NEW ERA LENDING, LLC Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/19 9:21 AM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311320 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00055 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 9:21 AM
Adversary case 17-00055 Complaint by JEREMIAH J FOSTER against NEW ERA LENDING, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contracts
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons