Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Referred: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Case #: 1:17-cv-23846
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2017
Terminated:Jun 15, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 17, 2018 4:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP
Represented By
Daniel Joseph Butler
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Scott Stephan Allen
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Doug Longhini
Represented By
Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Garcia-Menocal & Perez, P.L.
contact info
Anthony Joseph Perez
Garcia-Menocal & Perez, P.L.
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
22 22 order - Order (- NEW - PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 08/09 8:19 AM
FINAL ORDER of Dismissal re21 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal; Dismissing Action with prejudice; Case is Closed. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/8/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 27, 2018
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/27 4:44 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) with Prejudice by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP (Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
20 20 1 pgs order Order Fri 06/15 3:07 PM
ORDER on19 Notice of Settlement; Parties Notice of Dismissal, Stipulation of Dismissal or Final Judgment due 7/9/2018; Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/15/2018. (ls)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 06/15 3:07 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
19 19 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 06/14 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP (Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
18 18 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 9:59 AM
ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/1/2018 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 9/27/2018 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Amended Pleadings due by 5/24/2018., Discovery due by 7/18/2018., Expert Discovery due by 7/18/2018., Joinder of Parties due by 5/24/2018., Mediation Deadline 8/22/2018., In Limine Motions due by 9/4/2018., Dispositive Motions due by 7/23/2018., Motions due by 9/4/2018., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/11/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/22/2018.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/4/2018. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/12 2:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP (Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 12/12 2:14 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP(Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, December 05, 2017
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/05 12:51 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP. (Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 11/28 10:43 AM
Paperless ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have up to and including December 5, 2017, to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/28/2017. (tde)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline Tue 11/28 10:51 AM
Reset Answer Due Deadline per 14 Order: Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP response due 12/5/2017. (asl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/22 3:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re1 Complaint by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP. Responses due by 12/6/2017(Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for an Extension to Time to Responde to Plaintiff's Complaint
12 12 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/22 3:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP (Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/22 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Joseph Butler on behalf of Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP. Attorney Daniel Joseph Butler added to party Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP(pty:dft). (Butler, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 11/22 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Stephan Allen on behalf of Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP. Attorney Scott Stephan Allen added to party Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP(pty:dft). (Allen, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 11/17 11:33 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Doug Longhini. Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP served on 11/7/2017, answer due 11/28/2017. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/09 10:33 AM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Longhini identifying Corporate Parent Realty Associates Fund VIII, LLC, Corporate Parent Realty Associates Fund, VIII Texas Corporation, Corporate Parent Noel Posternak, Other Affiliate Michael A. Ruane, Other Affiliate Scott L. Dalrymple, Other Affiliate Nathan Foss, Other Affiliate James O. Buckingham, Other Affiliate James P. Raisides, Other Affiliate TA Realty LLC, Other Affiliate Thomas E. Landry, Other Affiliate Toshihiko Kazama, Other Affiliate Atsushi Nakajima, Other Affiliate Masaki Sakagawa, Other Affiliate Naoki Kuwabara, Other Affiliate Junji Inagawa, Other Affiliate Realty Associates Advisors Trust, Other Affiliate Elizabeth J. Ruane, Other Affiliate Charles D. Childers, Other Affiliate Charles D. Childers for Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2017
7 7 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 11/08 12:23 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re6 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all individuals/entities listed on6 . CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED -The Filer must refile the document using the Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all people/entities listed on6 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement are added (asl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/07 12:04 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
5 5 9 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 10/20 4:16 PM
Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/20/2017. (dq)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
4 4 order Clerks Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Thu 10/19 4:48 PM
Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 10/19 4:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP. (jc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 10/19 4:42 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Realty Associates Fund, VIII, LP. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10123997, filed by Doug Longhini.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)