Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00062
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2017
Terminated:Dec 19, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
ROSANNE HATZENBELLER
1229 Park Garden Rd
GREAT FALLS, MT 59404
Represented By
ROSANNE HATZENBELLER
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, August 08, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:17 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Wed 12/20 10:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/20/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)9 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/19 8:44 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-62 Closed. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
9 9 order Dismissing Proceedings Mon 12/18 5:03 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings Signed on 12/18/2017 Related [+]. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)8 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Friday, December 15, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 12/15 3:25 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding 17-00062 Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 23, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Thu 11/23 11:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)4 Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 11/22 1:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on ROSANNE HATZENBELLER 11/22/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 11/22 1:09 PM
Summons REIssued on ROSANNE HATZENBELLER Date Issued 11/22/2017, Answer Due 12/22/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
4 4 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Tue 11/21 9:34 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/5/2017. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Thursday, October 19, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/19 2:39 PM
Summons Issued on ROSANNE HATZENBELLER Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/19 1:40 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311531 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00062 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 1:39 PM
Adversary case 17-00062 Complaint by DAVID B COTNER, ERIC RYAN HENKEL, TRENT N BAKER, KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against ROSANNE HATZENBELLER. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2-yr Schedule
Att: 2 4-yr schedule
Att: 3 cover sheet
Att: 4 Summons