Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00063
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2017
Terminated:Mar 13, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
JUSTIN PENNER
219 Coulee Dr.
Bozeman, MT 59718
Represented By
JUSTIN PENNER
contact info
Defendant
HEATHER PENNER
219 Coulee Dr.
Bozeman, MT 59718
Represented By
HEATHER PENNER
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
Cotner Law, PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, August 08, 2019
11 11 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:32 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings Thu 03/15 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Dismiss Proceedings. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/15/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)9 Order Dismissing Proceedings
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
9 9 order Dismissing Proceedings Tue 03/13 1:54 PM
Order Dismissing Proceedings WITHOUT PREJUDICE Signed on 3/13/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)8 Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Tue 03/13 1:56 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-63 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 12, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/12 3:25 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER.(HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 14, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/14 7:34 AM
HEATHER PENNER Answer Deadline Reset for 2/5/2018; JUSTIN PENNER Answer Deadline Reset for 2/5/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/04 5:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on HEATHER PENNER 12/4/2017; JUSTIN PENNER 12/4/2017 Waiver of Service . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 23, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Thu 11/23 11:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)5 Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
5 5 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Tue 11/21 12:14 PM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/5/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 12:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on HEATHER PENNER 10/31/2017; JUSTIN PENNER 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/19 2:43 PM
Summons Issued on HEATHER PENNER Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017; JUSTIN PENNER Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/19 1:53 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311550 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00063 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 1:53 PM
Adversary case 17-00063 Complaint by DAVID B COTNER, ERIC RYAN HENKEL, TRENT N BAKER, KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against JUSTIN PENNER, HEATHER PENNER. Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summary of Transfers
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons