Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00064
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2017
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
DENNIS P CONNER
PO BOX 3028
GREAT FALLS, MT 59403
Represented By
DENNIS P CONNER
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Represented By
JOHN DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
Cotner Law, PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 8:23 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-64 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 20, 2020
49 49 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/20 10:08 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney Cory Laird removed from the case. Filed by DENNIS P CONNER. (Marr, Keith)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/20 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Keith Marr Filed by on behalf of DENNIS P CONNER. (Marr, Keith)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 26, 2020
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic) Sun 07/26 10:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/26/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)46 Order Reassigning Case
Friday, July 24, 2020
46 46 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 07/24 3:36 PM
Order Reassigning Case to Judge Whitman L. Holt. Involvement of Judge TERRY L MYERS Terminated Signed on 7/24/2020. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
45 45 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 4:23 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
44 44 court Generic Notice - ADV Mon 07/08 8:24 AM
ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE IS GRANTED, DATED 07/02/19 (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
43 43 answer Reply Tue 06/12 7:06 PM
Reply Filed by DENNIS P CONNER Related [+]. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-] (s)17 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Aff. Dennis Conner)
Saturday, May 26, 2018
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 05/26 10:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)41 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, May 24, 2018
41 41 order Extend Time Thu 05/24 11:38 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time; DEFENDANT DENNIS CONNER IS GRANTED UNTIL 06/12/18, TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE. Related [+] Signed on 5/24/2018. Document due by 6/12/2018.. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-] 40 (s)17 ,38
40 40 motion Extend Time Thu 05/24 8:23 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 19, 2018
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 05/19 10:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/19/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)38 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, May 17, 2018
38 38 order Extend Time Thu 05/17 3:35 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND COUNSEL FOR DENNIS CONNER SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING 05/29/18 TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF Related [+] Signed on 5/17/2018. Document due by 5/29/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 37
Monday, May 14, 2018
37 37 motion Extend Time Mon 05/14 11:41 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2018
36 36 court BNC Certificiate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Fri 05/11 10:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)35 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
35 35 court Notice of Hearing Wed 05/09 9:28 AM
Notice of Hearing ON MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF REFERENCE AND OBJECTION THERETO.34 17 MOTION HEARING scheduled for 6/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . HEARING IS BEING CONTINUED FROM THE DATE OF 06/13/18 (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
34 34 answer Reply/Response (Hearing Required) Mon 05/07 6:20 PM
Reply/Response - MOTION HEARING scheduled for 6/13/2018 at 09:00 AM at GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT . Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER Related [+]. Motion Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2018 at 09:00 AM GREAT FALLS HEARINGS; 125 CENTRAL AVE W; GREAT FALLS, MT. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-] (s)17 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER
Att: 1 Exhibit Proof Claim
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended POC
Att: 3 Exhibit withdrawal of claim
Att: 4 Exhibit Objection
Sunday, May 06, 2018
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 05/06 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/06/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)32 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, May 04, 2018
32 32 order Extend Time Fri 05/04 2:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 05/07/18 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE OF THIS ADVERSARY FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT Related [+] Signed on 5/4/2018. Document due by 5/7/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 31 (s)17 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER,29 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, May 03, 2018
31 31 motion Extend Time Thu 05/03 4:58 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 05, 2018
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Thu 04/05 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)29 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
29 29 order Extend Time Tue 04/03 3:37 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL MAY 4, 2018, TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING. Related [+] Signed on 4/3/2018. Document due by 5/4/2018.. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] 17 28 (s)17 22 Order on Motion to Extend Time,25 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, April 02, 2018
28 28 motion Extend Time Mon 04/02 2:11 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 26, 2018
27 27 motion Extend Time Mon 03/26 12:23 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 24, 2018
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 03/24 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/24/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)25 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, March 22, 2018
25 25 order Extend Time Thu 03/22 11:32 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING Related [+] Signed on 3/22/2018. Document due by 3/26/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 24 (s)17 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER
24 24 motion Extend Time Thu 03/22 8:58 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to file Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 11, 2018
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 03/11 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)22 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, March 09, 2018
22 22 order Extend Time Fri 03/09 1:44 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 03/23/18 TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE OF THIS ADVERSARY PROCEEDING FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT Related [+] Signed on 3/9/2018. Document due by 3/23/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 21 (s)20 Notice Giving Parties Time to Respond filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER
Thursday, March 08, 2018
21 21 motion Extend Time Thu 03/08 11:42 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Response Filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2018
20 20 notice Notice Giving Parties Time to Respond Thu 02/22 4:15 PM
Notice Giving Parties Time to Respond Filed by DENNIS P CONNER Related [+]. Objection Due by 3/8/2018. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-] (s)17 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER
19 19 15 pgs misc Memorandum Thu 02/22 3:48 PM
Memorandum in Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference of this Adversary Proceeding from Bankruptcy Court Filed by DENNIS P CONNER Related [+]. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-] (s)17 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER
Att: 1 Affidavit Ex. A (Aff. Dennis Conner)
18 18 crditcrd none Thu 02/22 3:44 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2353244 . Regarding the filing fee for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference 17-00064 TLM) [motion,mwdref] ( 181.00). Fee amount 181.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#17
17 17 motion Withdrawal of Reference Thu 02/22 3:41 PM
Motion for Withdrawal of Reference of this Adversary Proceeding from Bankruptcy Court . Fee Amount $181 Filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2018
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/05 1:21 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 20, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sat 01/20 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/20/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)14 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Thursday, January 18, 2018
14 14 order Extend Time Thu 01/18 2:18 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DEFENDANT DENNIS CONNER SHALL HAVE UP TO AND INCLUDING MONDAY 02/05/18 TO FILE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT Related Doc #13 ) Signed on 1/18/2018. Document due by 2/5/2018. Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
13 13 motion Extend Time Thu 01/18 10:16 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 01/18 2:19 PM
DENNIS P CONNER Answer Deadline Reset for 2/5/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 01/12 10:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
11 11 order Extend Time Wed 01/10 12:37 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DENNIS CONNER SHALL HAVE THROUGH MONDAY, JANUARY 29, 2018, TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT1 . Related [+] Signed on 1/10/2018. Document due by 1/29/2018. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-] 10
utility Update Answer Deadline Wed 01/10 12:38 PM
DENNIS P CONNER Answer Deadline Reset for 1/29/2018. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
10 10 motion Extend Time Tue 01/09 4:18 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time Filed by Defendant DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney for Debtor(s) Tue 01/09 4:11 PM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney for Debtor(s) CORY R LAIRD and CORY R LAIRD for DENNIS P CONNER, LAWRENCE R. REAM and CORY R LAIRD for DENNIS P CONNER added to the case. Filed by DENNIS P CONNER. (LAIRD, CORY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Thu 12/14 7:35 AM
DENNIS P CONNER Answer Deadline Reset for 1/16/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 11/30 12:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on DENNIS P CONNER 11/15/2017 Waiver of Service . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 23, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Thu 11/23 11:00 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to File Proof of Service Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/23/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)6 Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
6 6 court Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Tue 11/21 9:42 AM
Notice to File Appropriate Pleading or Case Will Be Referred to the Court for Dismissal Related [+]. Response Due by 12/5/2017. (Grady, Colleen)
Related: [-] (s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Monday, October 23, 2017
5 5 notice Notice Mon 10/23 8:48 AM
Notice of Corrected Cover Sheet Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
4 4 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 10/23 8:46 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney ERIC RYAN HENKEL removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Thu 10/19 3:08 PM
Summons Issued on DENNIS P CONNER Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017; JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 10/19/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/19 1:59 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311558 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00064 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 1:58 PM
Adversary case 17-00064 Complaint by DAVID B COTNER, ERIC RYAN HENKEL, TRENT N BAKER, KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against DENNIS P CONNER. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Redemption Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit Corporate Warranty Deed
Att: 3 Exhibit Payment Schedule
Att: 4 Cover Sheet
Att: 5 Summons