Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00067
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2017
Terminated:Jan 03, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.
251 LITTLE FALLS DR
WILMINGTON, DE 19808
Represented By
ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Represented By
JOHN DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Friday, January 03, 2020
36 36 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Proceedings Fri 01/03 9:43 AM
Order Dismissing Proceedings with Prejudice, with each party to pay its own fees and costs Signed on 1/3/2020 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)35 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/03 9:43 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-67 Closed. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2020
35 35 misc Stipulation - Attorney Event Thu 01/02 3:32 PM
Stipulation By JEREMIAH J FOSTER and On Deck Capital, Inc. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
34 34 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 08/08 5:30 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney TRENT N BAKER removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (BAKER, TRENT)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2019
33 33 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 06/14 3:42 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Attorney ERIC RYAN HENKEL removed from the case. Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 06, 2019
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 01/06 10:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/06/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)31 Order on Motion to Extend Time - ADV
Friday, January 04, 2019
31 31 order Extend Time Fri 01/04 12:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 03/15/19 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 1/4/2019. Document due by 3/15/2019.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 30 (s)28 Order on Motion to Extend Time - ADV
Friday, December 28, 2018
30 30 motion Motion to Extend Time - ADV Fri 12/28 11:26 AM
Joint Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 07, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 10/07 10:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/07/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)28 Order on Motion to Extend Time - ADV
Thursday, October 04, 2018
28 28 order Extend Time Fri 10/05 8:14 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DECK CAPITAL LLC AND TRUSTEE SHALL HAVE UNTIL 01/15/19 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 10/4/2018. Document due by 1/15/2019.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 27 (s)25 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, September 24, 2018
27 27 motion Extend Time Mon 09/24 11:00 AM
Joint Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 07/18 10:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)25 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, July 16, 2018
25 25 order Extend Time Mon 07/16 3:02 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND THE PARTIES SHALL HAVE UNTIL 11/16/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO ALL OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 7/16/2018. Document due by 11/16/2018.. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 24 (s)22 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, July 13, 2018
24 24 motion Extend Time Fri 07/13 1:48 PM
Joint Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 24, 2018
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Sun 06/24 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 06/24/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)22 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Friday, June 22, 2018
22 22 order Extend Time Fri 06/22 10:41 AM
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time TO RESPOND TO EACH OTHER'S OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY REQUESTS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISCOVERY REQUESTS ARE DUE ON OR BEFORE JULY 25, 2018. Related Doc #21 ) Signed on 6/22/2018. Document due by 7/25/2018. (Cunningham, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
21 21 motion Extend Time Thu 06/21 4:39 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 05/18 10:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)19 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
19 19 order Extend Time Wed 05/16 3:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND ON DECK CAPITAL INC SHALL HAVE UNTIL 07/25/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FOSTERS FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND UNTIL 08/29/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE TO FOSTERS SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS Related [+] Signed on 5/16/2018. Document due by 7/25/2018. (Mahoney, Patti) Modified on 5/16/2018 (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, May 15, 2018
18 18 motion Extend Time Tue 05/15 11:42 AM
Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Discovery Requests Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 09, 2018
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/09 2:55 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (JAMES, DOUG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 26, 2018
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation Thu 04/26 10:58 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Stipulation. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)15 Order Approving Stipulation
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
15 15 order Approving Stipulation Tue 04/24 8:53 AM
Order Approving Stipulation By & Between PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT AND ON DECK SHALL HAVE UNTIL 06/29/18 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FOSTERS SECOND SET OF DISCOVERY REQUEST Signed on 4/24/2018 Related [+]. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time,14 Stipulation filed by Defendant ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.
Monday, April 23, 2018
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 04/23 4:24 PM
Stipulation By ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. and Jeremiah Foster Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. Related [+]. (HOYT, MORGAN)
Related: [-] (s)13 Notice of Service of Discovery filed by Plaintiff JEREMIAH J FOSTER
Thursday, April 05, 2018
13 13 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 04/05 2:15 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (HENKEL, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 03/28 10:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/28/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (s)11 Order on Motion to Extend Time
Monday, March 26, 2018
11 11 order Extend Time Mon 03/26 10:56 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time AND DEFENDANT ON DECK CAPITAL INCS TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND TRUSTEE'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS IS EXTENDED TO 05/25/18 Related [+] Signed on 3/26/2018. Document due by 5/25/2018. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, March 23, 2018
10 10 motion Extend Time Fri 03/23 11:58 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time TO ANSER COMPLAINT AND TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY Filed by ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (JAMES, DOUG)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Generic Motion Fri 03/23 10:36 AM
Agreed Motion TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR ANSWERING COMPLAINT AND DISCOVERY Filed by Defendant ON DECK CAPITAL, INC.. (JAMES, DOUG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
8 8 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Wed 01/31 5:45 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Filed by JEREMIAH J FOSTER. (RYAN, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 11/30 12:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. 11/19/2017 Waiver of Service . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/21 10:04 AM
Summons Service Executed on ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. 11/21/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 11/15 12:57 PM
Summons REISSUED on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017; ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. Date Issued 11/15/2017, Answer Due 12/15/2017. (Mahoney, Patti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 10/31 10:53 AM
Summons Service Executed on ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. 10/31/2017 . (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 10/20 7:10 AM
Summons Issued on JOHN DOES 1-10 Date Issued 10/20/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017; ON DECK CAPITAL, INC. Date Issued 10/20/2017, Answer Due 11/20/2017. (Palmer, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/19 5:35 PM
Filing fee information: Receipt number 2311761 . Regarding the filing fee for Complaint 17-00067 TLM) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 10/19 5:35 PM
Adversary case 17-00067 Complaint by DAVID B COTNER, ERIC RYAN HENKEL, TRENT N BAKER, KYLE RYAN on behalf of JEREMIAH J FOSTER against ON DECK CAPITAL, INC., JOHN DOES 1-10. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (COTNER, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Contracts
Att: 2 Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Summons