Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-60979

Montana Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Terry L Myers
Case #: 2:17-ap-00072
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2017
Terminated:Oct 06, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
CAPITAL STACK, LLC
2715 Coney Island Ave.
Brooklyn, NY 11235
Represented By
CAPITAL STACK, LLC
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Represented By
JOHN DOES 1-10
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH J FOSTER
RESOLUTE COMMERCIAL 7201 E CAMELBACK RD STE 250
SCOTTSDALE, AZ 85251
Represented By
TRENT N BAKER
Datsopoulos, Macdonald & Lind
contact info
DAVID B COTNER
Cotner Law, PLLC
contact info
KYLE RYAN
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info
ERIC RYAN HENKEL
Cotner Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
53 53 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Tue 10/06 4:11 PM
It is ordered, based on the stipulation at ECF 176 in Adversary Proceeding 17-00028 Adversary Proceeding Nos. 17-00028 and 17-00072 are deconsolidated. The stipulation at ECF 176 is construed as a motion to dismiss Adversary Proceeding 17-00072 So construed, the motion is granted. Adversary Proceeding 17-00072 is dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 10/6/2020. (mmp)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 10/06 4:13 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-72 Closed. (mmp)
Related: [-]