Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:15-bk-23535

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Robert D Drain
Case #: 7:17-ap-08319
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 20, 2017
Terminated:May 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
JETRO CASH AND CARRY ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY
15-24 132nd Street
College Point, NJ 11356
Represented By
JETRO CASH AND CARRY ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY
contact info
Defendant
JRD HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY
1 Amity Street
Jersey City, NJ 07304
Represented By
JRD HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY
contact info
Defendant
JRD HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY
15-24 132nd Street
College Point, NJ 11356
Represented By
JRD HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY
contact info
Defendant
JETRO CASH & CARRY
1 Amity Street
Jersey City, NJ 07304
Represented By
JETRO CASH & CARRY
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II
Rich Michaelson Magaliff Moser, LLP 335 Madison Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Traurig
Diconza Traurig LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Thursday, May 17, 2018
9 9 order Motion, Approve Thu 05/17 3:49 PM
Order signed on 5/17/2018 Authorizing Entry Into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant To Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (A) Jetro Cash And Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, Jrd Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, Jrd Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry And Jetro Cash & Carry; (B) Porky Products, Inc.; (C) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; And (D) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Related [+]. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-] 6
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/17 4:27 PM
Adversary Case 7:17-ap-8319 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
8 8 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Wed 05/16 2:03 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 : Certificate of No Objection of Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6
Thursday, April 19, 2018
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Thu 04/19 5:34 PM
Affidavit of Service : Affidavit of Service of Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry Into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Motion, Approve Thu 04/19 1:04 PM
Motion to Approve : Motion of Howard P. Magaliff, in his Capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee, Seeking an Order Authorizing Entry into and Approving Settlement Agreements, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019, Between the Chapter 7 Trustee and (a) Jetro Cash and Carry Enterprises, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry, JRD Holdings, LLC d/b/a Jetro Cash & Carry and Jetro Cash & Carry; (b) Porky Products, Inc.; (c) Salem Truck Leasing, Inc.; and (d) Fairmont Foods, Inc. Presentment Date: May 14, 2018 at 12:00 Noon (EST). Objection Deadline: May 14, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. (EST) filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Presentment
Att: 2 Exhibits A - D: Settlement Agreements
Att: 3 Exhibit E: Proposed Order
Friday, January 12, 2018
5 5 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/12 4:21 PM
Scheduling and Pre-Trial Order signed on 1/12/2018. The Court will hold a final pre-trial conference on 5/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
4 4 misc Stipulation Mon 01/08 6:11 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond Related [+] Filed by Michael P. Pompeo on behalf of JETRO CASH & CARRY, JETRO CASH AND CARRY ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY, JRD HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY, JRD HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY. (Pompeo, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, October 24, 2017
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/24 1:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Complaint Related [+] Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Friday, October 20, 2017
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Fri 10/20 4:47 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/12/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 118, White Plains Courthouse, Answer due by 11/20/2017. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Fri 10/20 2:22 PM
Adversary case 17-08319 Complaint against JETRO CASH AND CARRY ENTERPRISES, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY, JRD HOLDINGS, INC. d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY, JRD HOLDINGS, LLC d/b/a JETRO CASH & CARRY, JETRO CASH & CARRY (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Jeffrey M. Traurig on behalf of Howard Magaliff, as Chapter 7 Trustee for Shelley Food Stores, Inc., II. (Traurig, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]