California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:17-cv-07732
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:6901 Environmental Cleanup Expenses
Case Filed:Oct 23, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Apr 21, 2018 1:36 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY, INCORPORATED, a California corporation
Represented By
Tim A Goetz
Tim Goetz Law Offices
contact info
Counter Claimant
MAGELLAN AEROSPACE, MIDDLETOWN, an Ohio corporation
Represented By
Bradley J Glass
Gallagher And Kennedy PA
contact info
Patricia M O'Toole
O'Toole Law Firm
contact info
Chris S Leason
Gallagher And Kennedy PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Hi-Shear Corporation
Represented By
David Lowell Evans
Hamrick And Evans LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
ESTERLINE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Donald J Kula
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Christopher D Thomas
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Hi-Shear Corporation
Represented By
David Lowell Evans
Hamrick And Evans LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
City of Torrance
Represented By
Richard G Montevideo
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Alan B Fenstermacher
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hi-Shear Corporation
Represented By
David Lowell Evans
Hamrick And Evans LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
City of Torrance
City Hall 3031 Torrance Blvd.
Torrance, CA 90503
Represented By
Richard G Montevideo
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
Alan B Fenstermacher
Rutan And Tucker LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
S.B.L. AUTO, INC. d/b/a SOUTH BAY LEXUS, a California corporation
Represented By
Brian D Langa
Demetriou Del Guercio Springer And Francis LLP
contact info
Tammy M J Hong
Demetriou Del Guercio Springer And Francis LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
MAGELLAN AEROSPACE, MIDDLETOWN, an Ohio corporation
Represented By
Bradley J Glass
Gallagher And Kennedy PA
contact info
Patricia M O'Toole
O'Toole Law Firm
contact info
Chris S Leason
Gallagher And Kennedy PA
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
PAUL SIMMONS GOLF COMPANY, a business entity form unknown
ThirdParty Defendant
R.G. HARRIS CO., a California Corporation
ThirdParty Defendant
RECREATIONAL VANS, INC., a California corporation
ThirdParty Defendant
REXNORD INDUSTRIES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, d/b/a REXNORD AEROSPACE, d/b/a TRIDAIR AEROSPACE MECHANISMS
Represented By
Charles E Weir
Mcdermott Will And Emery LLP
contact info
Jessica Mariani
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY, INCORPORATED, a California corporation
Represented By
Tim A Goetz
Tim Goetz Law Offices
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
the trustees of a certain TRUST AGREEMENT DATED NOVEMBER 1, 1977, BETWEEN KARL FRUDENFELD AND ELISABETH P. FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
SOLARAY INDUSTRIES, INC., a California corporation
ThirdParty Defendant
THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF THE ARMY
Represented By
Michael Ceja Martinez
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
TURNING POINT CAPITAL, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company
Represented By
Eric S Postma
Bittner And Hahs PC
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
The estate of ELISABETH P. FRUDENFELD, a deceased individual
ThirdParty Defendant
WILLIAM J. ADKINS, trustee of the ADKINS FAMILY TRUST, ESTABLISHED APRIL 16, 1991
ThirdParty Defendant
the estate of KARL FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
the executor, administrator, or trustee of the estate of KARL FRUDENFELD a deceased individual
ThirdParty Defendant
the trustees of a certain FREDRICK AND MARGARET SUTTON TRUST
ThirdParty Defendant
ALEXANDER FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
MARINA COOK
ThirdParty Defendant
DASCO ENGINEERING CORPORATION, a California corporation
Represented By
William J Beverly
Law Offices Of William J. Beverly
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
DCH TL HOLDINGS, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, d/b/a Torrance Toyota, d/b/a Torrance Scion
Represented By
Erin Kathleen Poppler
Bassi Edlin Huie And Blum LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
EFOC, INC., a Pennsylvania corporation, d/b/a ERIE PRESS SYSTEMS
ThirdParty Defendant
ESTERLINE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, a Delaware corporation
Represented By
Donald J Kula
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Andrea Jeanne Driggs
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Christopher D Thomas
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
ARBA, INC., a California corporation
ThirdParty Defendant
EXCELLON TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a California limited liability company, d/b/a EXCELLON AUTOMATION
ThirdParty Defendant
AARON FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
CRAIG FRUDENFELD, an individual, as custodian for ALEXANDER FRUDENFELD, AARON FRUDENFELD, and WENDI FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
KARLA FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
WENDI FRUDENFELD
ThirdParty Defendant
ROBERT G. HARRIS
ThirdParty Defendant
HF GROUP, INC., a California corporation
ThirdParty Defendant
the executor, administrator, or trustee of the estate of ELISABETH P. FRUDENFELD, a deceased individual
ThirdParty Defendant
JOSHMO, LLC, an Oregon limited liability company
ThirdParty Defendant
LAURI COOK, an individual, as custodian for MARINA COOK
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Hi-Shear Corporation
Represented By
David Lowell Evans
Hamrick And Evans LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
939 939 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 05/09 2:29 PM
OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of and Entry of Bar Order and Judgment 935 filed by Counter Defendant Magellan Aerospace, Middletown, Cross Defendant Magellan Aerospace, Middletown, Cross Claimant Magellan Aerospace, Middletown, ThirdParty Defendant Magellan Aerospace, Middletown. Related [+]
Related: [-] ndon, Patrick
Att: 1 Declaration of Patrick Rendon in Support of Opposition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1
Thursday, May 08, 2025
938 938 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 05/08 6:30 PM
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of and Entry of Bar Order and Judgment 935 filed by Cross Defendant Hi-Shear Corporation.(Poole, Jeff)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEFF POOLE IN SUPPORT OF HI-SHEAR CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS SBL PARTIES AND DCH HOLDINGS JOINT MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND ENTRY OF BAR ORDER,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Part 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit A Part 2
937 937 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Thu 05/08 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of and Entry of Bar Order and Judgment 935 filed by Defendant Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
936 936 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 05/08 12:31 PM
Robinson Helicopter Company's Objections to Evidence Submitted in Support of SBL Parties and DCH Holdings' Motion for Approval of Settlement and Entry of Bar Order Yes re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of and Entry of Bar Order and Judgment 935 filed by Defendant Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]