Attia et al v. Google LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Labson Freeman |
Referred: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-06037 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Oct 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara County Superior Court, 114CV-274103 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 21, 2018 2:59 AM PDT |
Creditor
Google, LLC
55 South Market Street Suite 1500
San Jose, CA 95113 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sergey Brin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jennifer Carlile
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas Chim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Flux Factory, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michelle Kaufmann
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Larry Page
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Augusto Roman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eric Teller
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sebastian Thrun
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eli Attia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eli Attia Architect PC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/01/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 07, 2021 | ||
157 | 157
1
pgs
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 01/07 10:49 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to152 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Eli Attia, Eli Attia Architect PC (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |