M & G Polymers USA, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12307
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12307
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-12268 |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
M & G Polymers USA, LLC
State Route 2
Apple Grove, WV 25502 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | West Virginia plastics maker M&G Polymers USA Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Wed 10/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
4
pgs
order
Final Decree
Mon 06/08 10:14 AM
Final Decree Closing Subsidiary Cases and Granting Related Relief. Signed on 6/3/2020 (LCN) |
|
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 06/08 10:19 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LCN) |
||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
misc
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 02/22 3:17 PM
Notice of Change of Address for Attorney Eric R. Perkins Filed by Banca Monte dei Paschi di Siena S.p.A., New York Branch. (Bressler, Gary) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
120
pgs
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Thu 01/25 10:51 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of M&G Polymers USA LLC Filed by M & G Polymers USA, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
30 | 30
162
pgs
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Thu 01/25 10:50 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of M&G Polymers USA LLC Filed by M & G Polymers USA, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
116
pgs
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 01/23 12:13 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of M&G Polymers USA LLC Filed by M & G Polymers USA, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
28 | 28
163
pgs
misc
Schedules/Statements
Tue 01/23 12:12 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of M&G Polymers USA LLC Filed by M & G Polymers USA, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
5
pgs
order
Order-Joint Admin
Wed 11/01 5:07 PM
Order Approving Motion for Joint Administration. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: M&G USA Corporation, M&G Resins USA, LLC, M&G Polymers USA, LLC, M&G Finance Corporation, M&G Waters USA, LLC, Mossi & Ghisolfi International, M&G Capital, M&G Chemicals S.A., M&G USA Holding, LLC, Chemtex International Inc., Chemtex Far East, Ltd. and Indo American Investments, Inc. in 17-12307 which should be consulted for all matters affecting this case Signed on 11/1/2017 (LCo) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 10/31 6:03 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Morton R. Branzburg, Esq. . Receipt Number 2083054, Filed by Magnate S.a.r.l.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
25 | 25
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 10/31 5:57 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jeremy David Evans of Kirkland & Ellis LLP . Receipt Number 2256744, Filed by Magnate S.a.r.l.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
24 | 24
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 10/31 5:55 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Joshua A. Sussberg of Kirkland & Ellis LLP . Receipt Number 2256744, Filed by Magnate S.a.r.l.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
23 | 23
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Tue 10/31 5:52 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Marc Kieselstein of Kirkland & Ellis LLP . Receipt Number 2256744, Filed by Magnate S.a.r.l.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 10/31 5:44 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Magnate S.a.r.l.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
|
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 10/31 12:28 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Jonathan S. Green, Esquir Order Signed on 10/31/2017. (JMW) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 10/31 12:27 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Marc N. Swanson, Esquire Order Signed on 10/31/2017. (JMW) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 10/31 12:27 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Stephen S. LaPlante, Esquire Order Signed on 10/31/2017. (JMW) |
|
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 10/31 12:26 PM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Steven A. Roach, Esquire Order Signed on 10/31/2017. (JMW) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 10/31 5:49 PM
Attorney Marc Kieselstein and Domenic E. Pacitti for Magnate S.a.r.l., Joshua A Sussberg and Domenic E. Pacitti for Magnate S.a.r.l., Jeremy David Evans and Domenic E. Pacitti for Magnate S.a.r.l., Morton R Branzburg and Domenic E. Pacitti for Magnate S.a.r.l. added to case Filed by Magnate S.a.r.l.. (Pacitti, Domenic) |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 10/30 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Banca Monte dei Paschi di Siena S.p.A., New York Branch. (Bressler, Gary) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 10/30 4:08 PM
Attorney Eric R Perkins and Gary D. Bressler for Banca Monte dei Paschi di Siena S.p.A., New York Branch added to case Filed by Banca Monte dei Paschi di Siena S.p.A., New York Branch. (Bressler, Gary) |
||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 10/27 3:25 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Jonathan S. Green . Receipt Number 2253532, Filed by Comerica Bank. (Bifferato, Karen) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 10/27 10:27 AM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Hull, Courtney) |
|
14 | 14
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Fri 10/27 9:31 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Marc N. Swanson . Receipt Number 2253532, Filed by Comerica Bank. (Bifferato, Karen) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Fri 10/27 9:01 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Flex Films (USA), Inc.. (Schnitzer, Edward) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Fri 10/27 9:21 AM
Attorney Rex Chatterjee and Edward L. Schnitzer for Flex Films (USA), Inc. added to case Filed by Flex Films (USA), Inc.. (Schnitzer, Edward) |
||
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
crditcrd
none
Thu 10/26 10:40 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12268 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8633890, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Thu 10/26 4:53 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Stephen S. LaPlante . Receipt Number 2253532, Filed by Comerica Bank. (Bifferato, Karen) |
|
10 | 10
4
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 10/26 4:31 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Pepsi-Cola Advertising and Marketing, Inc.. (Frank, Joseph) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Thu 10/26 4:19 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Steven A. Roach . Receipt Number 2253532, Filed by Comerica Bank. (Bifferato, Karen) |
|
8 | 8
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 10/26 4:04 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Comerica Bank. (Bifferato, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 10/26 3:46 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Morgan, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Certification of Government Attorney | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Thu 10/26 3:24 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance. Filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers"). (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 10/26 3:25 PM
Attorney Richard M. Seltzer and Susan E. Kaufman for United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers") added to case Filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers"). (Kaufman, Susan) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 10/26 4:09 PM
Attorney Jeffrey C. Wisler and Karen C. Bifferato for Comerica Bank, Kelly M. Conlan and Karen C. Bifferato for Comerica Bank, Jonathan S. Green and Karen C. Bifferato for Comerica Bank, Steven A. Roach and Karen C. Bifferato for Comerica Bank, Marc N. Swanson and Karen C. Bifferato for Comerica Bank, Stephen S. LaPlante and Karen C. Bifferato for Comerica Bank added to case Filed by Comerica Bank. (Bifferato, Karen) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Thu 10/26 6:45 PM
Attorney Jeremy C. Kleinman and Joseph D. Frank for Pepsi-Cola Advertising and Marketing, Inc. added to case Filed by Pepsi-Cola Advertising and Marketing, Inc.. (Frank, Joseph) |
||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Wed 10/25 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by Indorama Ventures Montreal L.P.. (Kizel, Paul) |
|
misc
Add Attorney
Wed 10/25 7:42 AM
Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Schepacarter, Richard) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
3
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 10/24 7:33 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by DAK Americas LLC. (Miller, Curtis) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Service List | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
notice
Appearance - Notice
Tue 10/24 3:39 PM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers"). (Kaufman, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Certificate of Service | ||
2 | 2
court
Standing Order/Transcripts
Tue 10/24 2:11 PM
The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 10/24/2017 to 11/7/2017. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber, Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080. (BJM) |
|
1 | 1
64
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tue 10/24 12:43 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by M & G Polymers USA, LLC. (Jones, Laura Davis) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Tue 10/24 1:18 PM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (LCo) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 10/24 3:42 PM
Attorney David R. Jury and Susan E. Kaufman for United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers"), Nathan Kilbert and Susan E. Kaufman for United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers") added to case Filed by United Steel, Paper and Forestry, Rubber, Manufacturing, Energy, Allied Industrial and Service Workers International Union ("United Steelworkers"). (Kaufman, Susan) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Tue 10/24 4:20 PM
Attorney Hannah Mufson McCollum and Hannah Mufson McCollum for U.S. Trustee added to case Filed by U.S. Trustee. (McCollum, Hannah) |