New Jersey District Court
Judge:Noel L Hillman
Referred: Karen M Williams
Case #: 1:17-cv-09019
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2017
Terminated:Mar 12, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Apr 15, 2018 5:47 AM EDT
Defendant
DCF-LO-CAMDEN NORTH
Defendant
KENNEDY HOSPITAL
Defendant
JOSEPH E. KARKARA
Defendant
BRADFORD GILL
Defendant
CARISSA FERGUSON-THOMAS
Defendant
EVESHAM TOWNSHIP CODE ENFORCERS
Defendant
ANN MARIE DONIO
Defendant
KELLY DONEGAN
Defendant
JENNIFER DISANTIS
Defendant
DELAWARE VALLEY PSYCHOLOGICAL SERVICES, LLC.
Defendant
JAMES LOUIS
Defendant
J. CLINE
Defendant
CHRIS CHRISTIE
Defendant
CENTRALIZED INFRACTIONS BUREAU
Defendant
CAMDEN PARKING AUTHORITY
Defendant
CAMDEN MUNICIPAL CODE ENFORCERS
Defendant
BRUCE BULLOCK
Defendant
DAWN BRANCH
Defendant
LORRAINE M. AUGUSTINI
Defendant
ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NEW JERSEY FOR THE DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Defendant
JOEL SCHNEIDER
Defendant
LISA VON PIER
Defendant
MERYL E. UDELL
Defendant
JESSICA TROMBETTA
Defendant
TENICHA TOWNSEND-MOBLEY
Defendant
CHARMAINE THOMAS
Defendant
SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY CHANCERY DIVISION, FAMILY PART
Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Defendant
ST. CECILIA SCHOOL
Defendant
ERICA G. SMITH
Defendant
STARR M. WATSON KIRKLAND
Defendant
BRIAN C. ROSS, ESQ.
Defendant
G. QUINTANA
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER S. PORRINO
Defendant
PHILADELPHIA PARKING AUTHORITY
Defendant
PENNSAUKEN MUNICIPAL CODE ENFORCERS
Defendant
NEW JERSEY SUPERIOR COURT
Defendant
NEW JERSEY MOTOR VEHICLE COMMISSIONER
Defendant
DEAN GIRARD NASSON
Defendant
IRIS MOORE
Defendant
DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY
Defendant
WESTVILLE CODE ENFORCERS
Defendant
DAVID GARNES
Defendant
PAUL FITZPATRICK
Defendant
MAUREEN F. FINNEGAN
Defendant
EDEN FAYTHE FELD
Defendant
EVESHAM MUNICIPAL COURT
Defendant
JENNY ESPINAL
Defendant
LINDA W. ENYON
Defendant
SHARON EGGLESTON, ESQ.
Defendant
KELLY DONEGAN, ESQ.
Defendant
STACI HEAVNER
Defendant
MARY EVA COLALILLO
Defendant
KAREN J. CAPLAN
Defendant
CAMDEN MUNICIPAL COURT
Defendant
CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT
Defendant
NALO BROWN
Defendant
CHERYL BEAUMONT
Defendant
RODERICK T. BALTIMORE
Defendant
DAVID ANDERSON
Defendant
WOODLYNNE MUNICIPAL CODE ENFORCERS
Defendant
MELISSA IDLER
Defendant
MARY WIESEMAN
Defendant
PALMIRA WHITE
Defendant
DONNA LEE VITALE, ESQ.
Defendant
CHRISTINE T.J. TUCKER
Defendant
OREN R. THOMAS, III
Defendant
URIJAH SUAREZ
Defendant
TONYA STEWART
Defendant
STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER LAW GUARDIAN
Defendant
ELISSA REDMER, ESQ.
Defendant
LAUREN PETTY, ESQ.
Defendant
STEVEN M. PETRILLO
Defendant
PENNSAUKEN MUNICIPAL COURT
Defendant
TEOFILO MONTANEZ-SANTIAGO
Defendant
MERCHANTVILLE MUNICIPAL COURT
Defendant
DONNA M. KENNEY
Defendant
ROSMARY S. KELLY
Defendant
ALICIA D. HOFFMEYER
Plaintiff
ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY
2268 41st Street
Pennsauken, NJ 08110

GPO Mar 12 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that plaintiff's IFP application is granted, the court shall file the plaintiff's complaint; ORDERED that the plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice; ORDERED that Plaintiff may move to reopen her case within twenty days from the date of this Order; ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/9/2018. (rtm, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, August 10, 2018
8 8 misc Letter Tue 08/14 3:56 PM
Letter from ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY.(rtm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
Monday, March 12, 2018
7 7 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Order Mon 03/12 9:28 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER that plaintiff's IFP application is granted, the court shall file the plaintiff's complaint; ORDERED that the plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice; ORDERED that Plaintiff may move to reopen her case within twenty days from the date of this Order; ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mark this case CLOSED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/9/2018. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Mon 03/12 9:31 AM
COMPLAINT4 against DAVID ANDERSON, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF NEW JERSEY FOR THE DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY, LORRAINE M. AUGUSTINI, RODERICK T. BALTIMORE, CHERYL BEAUMONT, DAWN BRANCH, NALO BROWN, BRUCE BULLOCK, CAMDEN COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, CAMDEN MUNICIPAL CODE ENFORCERS, CAMDEN MUNICIPAL COURT, CAMDEN PARKING AUTHORITY, KAREN J. CAPLAN, CENTRALIZED INFRACTIONS BUREAU, CHRIS CHRISTIE, J. CLINE, MARY EVA COLALILLO, DCF-LO-CAMDEN NORTH, DELAWARE VALLEY PSYCHOLOGICAL SERVICES, LLC., JENNIFER DISANTIS, DIVISION OF CHILD PROTECTION AND PERMANENCY, KELLY DONEGAN, KELLY DONEGAN, ESQ, ANN MARIE DONIO, SHARON EGGLESTON, ESQ, LINDA W. ENYON, JENNY ESPINAL, EVESHAM MUNICIPAL COURT, EVESHAM TOWNSHIP CODE ENFORCERS, EDEN FAYTHE FELD, CARISSA FERGUSON-THOMAS, MAUREEN F. FINNEGAN, PAUL FITZPATRICK, DAVID GARNES, BRADFORD GILL, STACI HEAVNER, ALICIA D. HOFFMEYER, MELISSA IDLER, JOSEPH E. KARKARA, ROSMARY S. KELLY, KENNEDY HOSPITAL, DONNA M. KENNEY, JAMES LOUIS, MERCHANTVILLE MUNICIPAL COURT, TEOFILO MONTANEZ-SANTIAGO, IRIS MOORE, DEAN GIRARD NASSON, NEW JERSEY MOTOR VEHICLE COMMISSIONER, NEW JERSEY SUPERIOR COURT, PENNSAUKEN MUNICIPAL CODE ENFORCERS, PENNSAUKEN MUNICIPAL COURT, STEVEN M. PETRILLO, LAUREN PETTY, ESQ, PHILADELPHIA PARKING AUTHORITY, CHRISTOPHER S. PORRINO, G. QUINTANA, ELISSA REDMER, ESQ, BRIAN C. ROSS, ESQ, JOEL SCHNEIDER, ERICA G. SMITH, ST. CECILIA SCHOOL, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER LAW GUARDIAN, TONYA STEWART, URIJAH SUAREZ, SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY CHANCERY DIVISION, FAMILY PART, CHARMAINE THOMAS, OREN R. THOMAS, III, TENICHA TOWNSEND-MOBLEY, JESSICA TROMBETTA, CHRISTINE T.J. TUCKER, MERYL E. UDELL, DONNA LEE VITALE, ESQ, LISA VON PIER, STARR M. WATSON KIRKLAND, WESTVILLE CODE ENFORCERS, PALMIRA WHITE, MARY WIESEMAN, filed by ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY.(rtm, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/12 10:21 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
6 6 misc Application/Petition Fri 12/22 2:16 PM
APPLICATION of Propria Motu for emergency relief for by ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY. (jbk, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 12/12 2:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Fact (Notice of Default Judgment) by ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY. (tf, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 12/12 11:08 AM
Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2017
4 4 service Complaint Received Fri 12/01 9:48 AM
AMENDED Complaint Received. (jbk, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2017
3 3 misc Application to Proceed IFP Tue 11/14 2:10 PM
APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY. (rss, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 11/01 2:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
2 2 misc Affidavit Fri 10/27 10:09 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Acknowledgement file by ATIYA KIRKLAND BEY. (rtm, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 25, 2017
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 10/25 1:58 PM
Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. (dd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2017
1 1 service Complaint Received Tue 10/24 11:42 AM
Complaint Received. NO IFP/FF (jbk, )
Related: [-]