Johnson v. US
Original Case: 1:17-cv-00353
Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cvus-01091 |
Type | civil us |
Nature of Suit | 528 |
Case Filed: | Oct 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 15, 2018 3:40 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/15/2018 3:35 AM EST |
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/17/2017. [470091] Fee/IFP due on 11/07/2017. | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Docketing | ||
Att: 2 26 pgs Civil case docketed | ||
2 | 2 Note to file: The following cases are associated 17-2569 (lead) with 18-1091 (consol.). FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [470093] 17-2569 18-1091 |