Wild Calling Pet Foods, LLC
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas B Mcnamara |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-19898 |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 16, 2018 |
Converted: | Mar 29, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Wild Calling Pet Food, LLC
5428 W 7th Street Rd
Greeley, CO 80634-4445 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Wild Calling Pet Foods, LLC
5428 W 7th Street Rd
Greeley, CO 80634-4445 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Jeffrey L. Hill
Jeffrey L. Hill, P.C P.O. Box 1720
Parker, CO 80134 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2022 6:55 AM MDT |
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 10/25 4:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Total Number of Creditors Uploaded: 125. Chapter 11 Plan due by 02/22/2018. Disclosure Statement due by 02/22/2018. (Lofstedt, Joli) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 10/25 4:57 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition- Chapter 11 17-19898 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 25328973. Fee amount 1717.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Thu 10/26 9:07 AM
Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Joli A. Lofstedt on behalf of Wild Calling Pet Food, LLC . (ek) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)
Thu 10/26 9:08 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1 Filed by Joli A. Lofstedt on behalf of Wild Calling Pet Food, LLC . (ek) |