Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51827
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2017
Terminated:Jan 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
ConAgra Brands, Inc.
One ConAgra Drive
Omaha, NE 68102
Represented By
ConAgra Brands, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Norman Christopher Griffiths
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/17 11:41 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51827 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
5 5 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 01/16 11:39 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 01/02 11:53 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, Peter Kravitz, Peter S. Kravitz, Esq., Peter S. Kravitz as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/26 3:43 PM
Amended Complaint to Add additional documents Filed by Peter Kravitz Related [+] AP Summons Served due date: 01/24/2018. (Griffiths, Norman) Modified text on 10/26/2017 (LCN)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 10/26 3:04 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51827 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8633415, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 10/26 3:02 PM
Adversary case 17-51827 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547, 548, 549 and 550 and to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 502 by Peter Kravitz against ConAgra Brands, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)). AP Summons Served due date: 01/24/2018. (Griffiths, Norman)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives