Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51829
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2017
Terminated:Aug 09, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
CBS Radio Inc.
1271 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020
Represented By
CBS Radio Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, August 09, 2018
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/09 9:13 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding related document(s)1 ,9 Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Manning, Margaret)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/09 2:53 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51829 Closed (SJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/02 3:20 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by CBS Radio Inc. (Barillare, Jody) Modified text on 3/5/2018 (MML)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 03/02 3:19 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by CBS Radio Inc. (Barillare, Jody)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2018
7 7 motion Stipulation Fri 02/02 1:50 PM
Stipulation Between Peter Kravitz and Defendant to Extend Time to Respond to Preference Actions . Filed by Peter Kravitz Related [+]. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 01/02 11:53 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, Peter Kravitz, Peter S. Kravitz, Esq., Peter S. Kravitz as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2017
5 5 8 pgs order Order Thu 12/07 11:41 AM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal To $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff. Related [+] Order Signed on 12/6/2017. (LCN)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, December 06, 2017
4 4 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 12/06 1:55 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal To $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, November 02, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 11/02 5:15 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant CBS Radio Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/2/2018. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 27, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 10/27 1:07 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51829 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8634591, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 10/26 4:51 PM
Adversary case 17-51829 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against CBS Radio Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 01/24/2018. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives