Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51830
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2017
Terminated:Aug 15, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
IHeartMedia, Inc.
200 East Basse Road
San Antonio, TX 78209
Represented By
IHeartMedia, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust
Represented By
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/15 3:18 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51830 Closed (LCN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2019
9 9 notice Dismissal - Notice Wed 08/14 11:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Kurth, Mette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
8 8 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy - Adversary Wed 06/06 3:48 PM
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Filed by iHeartMedia, Inc.. (Manning, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Add Attorney Wed 06/06 3:54 PM
Attorney Margaret M. Manning and Margaret M. Manning for Peter Kravitz added to case Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Manning, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Wed 01/03 12:04 PM
Certificate of Service of Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
6 6 6 pgs order Order Tue 01/02 3:52 PM
Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings With Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000 Brought by Plaintiff. Signed on 1/2/2018 (LCN)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 01/02 11:53 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by Peter Kravitz, Peter Kravitz, Peter S. Kravitz, Esq., Peter S. Kravitz as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2017
4 4 misc Certificate of Counsel (Multi) Fri 12/29 10:25 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings with Total in Controversy Less Than or Equal to $75,000.00 Brought by Plaintiff Pursuant to Sections 502, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by Peter Kravitz. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 11/02 5:16 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant IHeartMedia, Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/2/2018. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 27, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 10/27 1:07 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51830 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8634591, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 10/26 4:53 PM
Adversary case 17-51830 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against IHeartMedia, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 01/24/2018. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives