Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-12220

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-ap-51835
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Oct 26, 2017
Terminated:Dec 11, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stephanie D. Lasker
170 Butler Court
Claremont, CA 91711
Represented By
Stephanie D. Lasker
contact info
Plaintiff
Peter Kravitz, as Liquidating Trustee of the Fresh & Easy Liquidating Trust
Represented By
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, December 11, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/11 10:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-51835 Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2017
4 4 notice Dismissal - Notice Fri 12/08 2:07 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Peter Kravitz (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, November 02, 2017
3 3 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Thu 11/02 5:19 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Stephanie D. Lasker. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 1/2/2018. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, October 27, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 10/27 1:07 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-51835 BLS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8634591, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 10/26 5:05 PM
Adversary case 17-51835 Complaint by Peter Kravitz against Stephanie D. Lasker. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 01/24/2018. (Bird, L. John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives