New York Southern District Court
Judge:George B Daniels
Case #: 1:17-cv-08326
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2ag Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2017
Terminated:Jan 08, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 25, 2018 5:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Irene Macyk
Defendant
Northwell Health System
Plaintiff
Allan Weidenbaum
Represented By
Kristian Ellie Alfonso
Ballon, Stoll, Bader And Nadler
contact info
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon, Stoll, Bader And Nadler
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 08, 2018
12 12 order Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Mon 01/08 12:51 PM
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties, that the above action is hereby dismissed as to all Defendants with prejudice, without attorneys' fees or costs to any party as against the other. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/8/2018) (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
11 11 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/05 11:53 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) Irene Macyk, Northwell Health System and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Allan Weidenbaum.(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2017
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 12/01 11:51 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Northwell Health System served on 11/9/2017, answer due 11/30/2017. Service was accepted by Barbara Martinez, Legal Clerk. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Allan Weidenbaum. (Alfonso, Kristian)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 12/01 11:47 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Irene Macyk served on 11/14/2017, answer due 12/5/2017. Service was accepted by Angela Grasso. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Allan Weidenbaum. (Alfonso, Kristian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/01 3:54 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristian Ellie Alfonso on behalf of Allan Weidenbaum. (Alfonso, Kristian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 10/31 1:54 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Irene Macyk. (vf)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 10/31 1:52 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Northwell Health System. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2017
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/30 5:07 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Irene Macyk, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Allan Weidenbaum. (Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 10/30 5:06 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Northwell Health System, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Allan Weidenbaum. (Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 10/30 4:15 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A at the United States District Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/30/2017) (mro)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 10/30 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marshall Benjamin Bellovin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 10/30 10:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 10/30 10:23 AM
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 10/30 10:23 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2017
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 10/27 6:36 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/27 6:35 PM
COMPLAINT against Irene Macyk, Northwell Health System. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14298777)Document filed by Allan Weidenbaum.(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh.1 Notice of Right to Sue