Alisha Morris-O'Brien v. Dept of Family Protc Services
Original Case: 5:17-cv-00032
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cr-11264 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 13, 2018 2:25 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
ALISHA MORRIS-O'BRIEN, On behalf of Minor Children: L.P., I.B., P.S-D., K.D., S.J., S.J.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/13/2018 2:25 AM CST |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
1 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Alisha Morris-O'Brien 17-11264 (MVM) |