Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-34025
Lead case is: 3:17-bk-34025
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Harlin Dewayne Hale |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-34031 |
Case Filed: | Oct 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $500,001 to $1 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc.
253 Enterprise Dr
McKinney, TX 75069-7343 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75242 |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Final decree (Case closed) . Entered on 1/28/2020 (Blanco, J.) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: Claim Number 3 Filed by Creditor Internal Revenue Service. (Bishop, Earl) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Withdrawal of claim(s) Claim has been satisfied. Claim: Claim Number 14 Filed by Creditor Internal Revenue Service. (Bishop, Earl) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
![]() BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/28/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Assignment/Transfer of claim. Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Corridor Mobile Medical Services To TRC Master Fund LLC. To TRC Master Fund LLC Filed by Interested Party TR Capital Management, LLC. (Ross, Terrel) |
|
crditcrd
none
Fri 03/23 12:45 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Assignment/Transfer of claim 17-34031 hdh11) [claims,trasclm] ( 25.00). Receipt number 24960611, amount $ 25.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, November 19, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/19/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11 & 12
Thu 11/16 4:34 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at Dallas, Room 976. Proofs of Claims due by 3/14/2018. Attorney(s)certificate of service of 341 meeting chapter 11 to be filed by 12/18/2017. (Neary, William) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. . Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc.. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Schedules: Schedules A/B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities. Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc.. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Aaron Michael Kaufman filed by Creditor Reliant Rehab Pro, LLC. (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 3:17-bk-34025 with member case 3:17-bk-34031 Entered on 11/1/2017. (Whitaker, Sheniqua) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Certificate of service re: Supplemental Certificate of Service regarding First Day Documents filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. |
|
15 | 15
![]() Notice [Agenda of First Day Hearings and Index of First Day Pleadings] filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. . (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() Amended Motion. [Amended Motion for Order Authorizing Continued Use of Cash Management System, Existing Bank Accounts, Existing Business Forms, and Maintenance of Existing Investment Practices] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Witness and Exhibit List filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. . (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
12 | 12
![]() Expedited Notice of hearing filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. . Hearing to be held on 11/1/2017 at 09:00 AM Dallas Judge Hale Ctrm for7 and for6 and for8 and for3 and for2 and for5 and for4 , (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
11 | 11
![]() Application to employ Kane Russell Coleman Logan PC as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() Declaration re: of Keith J. Mutschler in Support of Debtors' First Day Motions and Applications filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. . (Kane, John) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Motion for expedited hearin Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for leave [Motion to Preclude Appointment of Patient Care Ombudsman] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Motion to establish procedures to Protect Confidential Resident Information. Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Ex Parte Motion to limit notice Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Motion to maintain bank accounts. [Motion for Order Authorizing Continued Use of Cash Management System, Existing Bank Accounts, Existing Business Forms, and Maintenance of Existing Investment Practices] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
4 | 4
![]() Motion to pay pre-petition debt [Motion to Approve Payment of Pre-petition Wages, Taxes and Benefits and To Continue Employee Programs in the Ordinary Course of the Debtors' Business] Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
3 | 3
![]() Motion for joint administration of cases 17-34025 17-34031 17-34034 17-34028 Filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() Notice of designation as complex chapter 11 case filed by Debtor Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc.. (Kane, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Nexion Health at McKinney, Inc. (Coleman, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 10/30 1:23 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11) 17-34031 11) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 24384366, amount $1717.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |