Blackbird Tech LLC v. Cloudflare, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-06112 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 23, 2018 1:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
CloudFlare, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blackbird Tech LLC
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Project Jengo Saga: How Cloudflare Stood up to a Patent Troll - and Won! (blog.cloudflare.com) |
Submitted Tue 11/05/2019 | |
2. | Bye Bye Blackbird (blog.cloudflare.com) |
Submitted Tue 02/13/2018 | |