Original Case: 1:17-cv-00482

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:18-cvus-01122
Typecivil us
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2017
Terminated:Jul 17, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 18, 2018 4:36 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
Represented By
Benjamin T. Hickman
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Kimere Jane Kimball
Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of
contact info
Thomas W. Krause
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Nathan K. Kelley
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Tracy Doherty-McCormick
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Michael S. Forman
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSEPH MATAL, Performing the Functions & Duties of Director of the US Patent & Trademark Ofc
Represented By
Kimere Jane Kimball
Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By
Benjamin T. Hickman
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Kimere Jane Kimball
Office of the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of
contact info
Thomas W. Krause
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Nathan K. Kelley
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Tracy Doherty-McCormick
Office of the United States Attorney
contact info
Michael S. Forman
United States Patent and Trademark Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MITCHELL R. SWARTZ
Represented By
Mitchell R. Swartz
-
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/18/2018 4:30 AM EDT
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 10/26/2017. [471937] Entry of Appearance due 11/14/2017. Appellant/Petitioner's Informal brief is due 11/21/2017. [FMS] [Entered: 10/31/2017 01:40 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 32 pgs Civil case docketed