Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Cam Ferenbach
Case #: 2:17-cv-02760
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2017
Terminated:May 08, 2018
Last checked: Monday Apr 30, 2018 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Cortland Development, LLC
Represented By
Jessica A Green
Lipson, Neilson, Cole, Seltzer & Garin, P.C.
contact info
Joseph P Garin
Lipson Neilson P.C.
contact info
Donald W. Benson
Hall Booth Smith, P.C.
contact info
Lisa J Zastrow
Lipson Neilson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
John Robert Benson
10091 Park Run Dr Ste 200 LAS VEGAS
LAS VEGAS, NV 89145
Represented By
Andrew L Rempfer
Law Offices Of Steven J. Parsons
contact info
Joseph Nathan Mott
Law Offices Of Steven J. Parsons
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 08, 2018
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation of Dismissal ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 05/08 10:37 AM
ORDER Granting26 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 07, 2018
26 26 motion Stipulation Dismissal Mon 05/07 3:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff John Robert Benson. (Mott, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 06, 2018
25 25 minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Change Venue Fri 04/06 3:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/6/2018. Given that the parties have reached a settlement of this dispute 24 , the defendant's motion to transfer venue22 is denied without prejudice as moot. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
Related: [-]
24 24 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 04/06 2:26 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 4/6/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Crtrm Administrator: N. Vaglio ; Pla Counsel: Joseph Mott ; Def Counsel: Joseph Garin and Donald Benson ; Time of Hearing: 9:30 a.m. - 1:02 p.m. ; Recording start and end times: SEALED 12:59:23 p.m. - 1:02:06 p.m. ; Courtroom: 3B . Plaintiff and Defendant Representative are present with counsel. The parties participated in an Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and a settlement has been reached. The terms of the confidential settlement are read into the record which is SEALED . The Court canvasses the parties. IT IS ORDERED that a Stipulation of Dismissal and Proposed Order must be filed by 5/7/2018. In light of settlement, the Court vacates any deadlines that occur prior to the deadline to file a Stipulation of Dismissal. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 04, 2018
22 22 motion Motion Change Venue/Transfer Wed 04/04 3:18 PM
MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 4/18/2018. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Monday, April 02, 2018
20 20 6 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/03 9:27 AM
ORDER Granting19 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald W. Benson for Cortland Development, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Joseph P. Garin. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/2/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 04/02 10:25 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Donald W. Benson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Joseph P. Garin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5032633) by Defendant Cortland Development, LLC. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Tue 03/06 11:47 AM
ORDER Granting17 Stipulation to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation. Early Neutral Evaluation reset for 4/6/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stipulation Tue 03/06 8:52 AM
STIPULATION and Order to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference re 15 Order on Motion,,, Minute Order,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,, by Defendant Cortland Development, LLC. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
16 16 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Tue 02/20 12:16 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Don Benson to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 4/6/2018. (no image attached) (DKJ)
Related: [-]
15 15 minord Minute Order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/20 11:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/20/2018. Pending before the Court is an emergency motion to continue the early neutral evaluation in this case. Docket No. 14. That motion is hereby GRANTED, and the early neutral evaluation is VACATED. No later March 6, 2018, the parties shall file a stipulation with five alternative dates on which all required participants are available for the early neutral evaluation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/20 11:25 AM
Emergency MOTION re8 Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session, by Defendant Cortland Development, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2018. (Garin, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, February 12, 2018
13 13 notice Notice Other Mon 02/12 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Change of Firm by John Robert Benson. Related [+]
Related: [-] mpfer, Andrew
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
12 12 3 pgs misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 01/10 10:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cortland Development, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate The Kenjack Trust, Other Affiliate Steven DeFrancis, Other Affiliate Christopher Graham, Other Affiliate Michelle Enick, Other Affiliate The Jane and Bear Trust, Other Affiliate Michael Altman, Other Affiliate Amy McCullough, Other Affiliate Craig Perry, Other Affiliate Brad Brown, Other Affiliate Ned Stiker, Other Affiliate Paul M. Wrights, Other Affiliate Cortland Associates, LLC, Other Affiliate Share Class F, LLC for Cortland Development, LLC added. (Green, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2018
11 11 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge & Short Trial Rules Fri 01/05 3:15 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take 3 days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (MR)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 3:15 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/6/2018. Motions due by 7/6/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order Fri 01/05 10:35 AM
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff John Robert Benson Related [+]
Related: [-] mpfer, Andrew
Friday, December 08, 2017
8 8 4 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Fri 12/08 3:48 PM
ORDER Regarding Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/22/2018 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted, in an envelope marked "Confidential," directly to undersigned's box in the Clerk's Office not later than 3:00 p.m. on 2/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/08 8:52 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by Cortland Development, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/22/2018.(Green, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 11/20 4:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Robert Benson re4 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,,. Cortland Development, LLC served on 11/17/2017, answer due 12/8/2017. Related [+]
Related: [-] mpfer, Andrew
Thursday, November 02, 2017
5 5 minord Minute Order Thu 11/02 3:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 11/2/2017. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 11/02 9:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Cortland Development, LLC re1 Complaint. (MR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
3 3 notice ENE Notice Thu 11/02 9:17 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Certificate of Interested Parties Wed 11/01 4:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by John Robert Benson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . Related [+]
Related: [-] mpfer, Andrew
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/01 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Cortland Development, LLC, d/b/a Cortland Partners (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4838951), filed by John Robert Benson. Proof of service due by 1/30/2018. Related [+]
Related: [-] mpfer, Andrew
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 11/02 9:14 AM
Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
Related: [-]