London Trust Media, Inc. v. Server Sitters, LLC
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Trenga |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01244 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 30, 2018 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
Server Sitters, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
London Trust Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
So Ordered
Tue 11/28 9:25 AM
So Ordered in re7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by London Trust Media, Inc. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/28/2017. (jlan) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 11/27 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by London Trust Media, Inc. (Sullivan, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 11/15 1:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Server Sitters, LLC served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017 (jlan) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 11/07 1:37 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Culp Cloyd and Certification of Local Counsel Courtney A. Sullivan. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/07/2017. (jlan) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 11/03 3:20 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly Culp Cloyd and Certification of Local Counsel Courtney A. Sullivan Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5795491. by London Trust Media, Inc.. (Sullivan, Courtney) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/02 7:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Server Sitters, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 Notice | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Thu 11/02 7:46 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by London Trust Media, Inc. (jlan) |
|
1 | 1
33
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/02 7:46 AM
COMPLAINT against Server Sitters, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5790353) filed by London Trust Media, Inc.(jlan) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet |