Ambrezewicz et al v. GDFriend, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | M James Lorenz |
Referred: | Jan M Adler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-02234 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227(b)(3) Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 |
Case Filed: | Nov 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 30, 2018 1:53 AM PDT |
Defendant
GDFriend, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lucas Ambrezewicz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Haigler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Timmons
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/19 10:31 AM
ORDER granting23 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice as to Plaintiffs individual action, and without prejudice as to the putative class claims asserted in the lawsuit. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/18/2018. (sjt) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/18 1:46 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by GDFriend, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference
Tue 05/29 5:24 PM
Order Vacating Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/29/2018.(sjt) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 05/29 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by GDFriend, Inc. (Kaminski, David) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 05/17 3:55 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/17/2018. (sjt) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Appear
Thu 05/17 12:26 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Attorneys-Only ENE Conference by GDFriend, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 04/10 2:33 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/30/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/9/2018.(sjt) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Mon 03/26 4:49 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by GDFriend, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Kaminski, David) |
|
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/26 4:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by GDFriend, Inc..(Kaminski, David) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Mon 03/12 11:42 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Alyssa Milman White terminated. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/12/2018. (anh) |
|
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 03/12 11:37 AM
ORDER denying7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 3/12/2018. (anh) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 03/09 10:30 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by GDFriend, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 03/07 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Blake J. Dugger (Dugger, Blake) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/21 6:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by David J Kaminski on behalf of GDFriend, Inc. (Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party GDFriend, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Wed 01/10 2:38 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by GDFriend, Inc.. Amendment to9 Reply to Response to Motion Proof of Service of Reply to Response .(White, Alyssa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Proof of Service | ||
9 | 9
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 01/10 2:07 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re7 MOTION to Stay filed by GDFriend, Inc.. (White, Alyssa) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/04 4:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re7 MOTION to Stay filed by Lucas Ambrezewicz, Mark Haigler, Edward Timmons. (Dugger, Blake) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Stay
Thu 12/07 4:25 PM
MOTION to Stay by GDFriend, Inc..(White, Alyssa)Attorney Alyssa Milman White added to party GDFriend, Inc.(pty:dft) |
|
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Alyssa Milman White in Support of Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration - Complaint in Ambrezewicz v. Leadpoint, Inc., (U.S. Dist.-C.D. Cal., No. 5:16-cv-02331-JGB-KK), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration - Sandoval v. Friendlum, Inc. dba Direct Home Energy Solutions, etc. (U.S. Dist.- S.D. Cal., Case No. 3:17-cv-01917-MMA-BGS), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration - Declaratory ruling of July 10, 2015 of the Federal Communications Commission in In the Matter of Rules and Regulations Implementing the Telephone Consumer Protection Act of 1991 (CG Docket No. 02-278), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration - Joint Brief for Petitioners in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 1 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 2 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 3 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 4 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 5 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 6 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 7 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration (Part 8 of 8) - ACA Internationals Amended Petition for Review in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 , | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration - General Docket in ACA International v. Federal Communications Commission (D.C. Cir. Case No. 15-1211 as of December 4, 2017 | ||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 11/22 8:41 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Blake J. Dugger (Dugger, Blake)(QC mailer sent re: address info not changed in CM) (sjt) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 11/17 9:06 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucas Ambrezewicz, Edward Timmons, Mark Haigler. All Defendants served. (Theis, Bryan) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Pro Hac Vice Approved - Clerk
Fri 11/03 3:21 PM
PRO HAC APPROVED: Blake J. Dugger appearing for Plaintiffs Lucas Ambrezewicz, Mark Haigler, Edward Timmons. (no document attached) (kcm) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 11/02 5:01 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number 0974-10599354.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Dugger, Blake) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 11/02 9:41 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rmc) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 11/02 9:36 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against GDFriend, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-10594845), filed by Lucas Ambrezewicz, Edward Timmons, Mark Haigler. The new case number is 3:17-cv-2234-L-JMA. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Theis, Bryan)(rmc) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Case Cover Sheet |