Woodside Management Inc.
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mary Kay Vyskocil |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-13150 |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 11, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Woodside Management Inc.
25 E 86th St Apt 9F
New York, NY 10028-0553 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 01/11 11:19 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-1211 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Rodriguez, Maria) |
||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 01/11 11:23 AM
Case Closed. (Rodriguez, Maria) |
||
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Certificate of Mailing - Inter-District Transfer
Sun 12/03 12:25 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Inter-District Transfer . Notice Date 12/02/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Notice, Inter-District Transfer (BK) (BNC)
Thu 11/30 8:32 AM
Notice of Inter-District Transfer to Eastern District of New York, Under Case Number 17-46310 (Richards, Beverly) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Notice, Inter-District Transfer (BK) (BNC)
Thu 11/30 8:22 AM
Notice of Inter-District Transfer to Eastern District of New York, Under Case Number 17-46310 (Richards, Beverly) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order, Transferring Venue
Tue 11/28 3:55 PM
(COPY)Order signed on 11/28/2017 by Honorable Carla E. Craig, United States Bankruptcy Judge, United States Bankruptcy Court, Eastern District of New York Re: Transferring Venue of the bankruptcy cases of Woodside Management Inc., 28th Street Management Inc., Tunnel Management LLC, and Downtown Management LLC from the Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York to the Bankruptcy Court for the Eastern District of New York. (Gomez, Jessica) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit of Service
Mon 11/27 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service Filed by Rachel A. Parisi on behalf of Woodside Management Inc.. (Parisi, Rachel) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 11/22 10:46 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Leslie S. Barr on behalf of ConnectOne Bank. (Barr, Leslie) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 11/21 10:47 AM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Mamed Dzhaniyev, Vladimir Basin, Boris Basin, Galina Shegelman, Vas Taxi Inc., Yellow City LLC, Yellow Diamond Taxi LLC, Yellow Rocket Taxi LLC, Yellow Carriage Taxi LLC, Yellow Devil Taxi LLC, Yellow Cravan Taxi LLC, Daniyal Taxi Inc., Dochenka Taxi Inc., Twinkle Cab Corp., King Mario Taxi Inc., Junco Taxi Inc., Cabbo Service Corp., Al-All Cab Corp., Libnoth Cap Corp., Philip Taxi Inc., King Ed Taxi Inc., NY Kfar Taxi Corp., Oak Taxi Inc., Flamingo Taxi Inc., Goryanka Taxi, Gores Taxi Inc., Dama Taxi Inc., Danushka Taxi Inc., Vobla Taxi Inc., Bratishka Taxi Inc., Kormilitsa Taxi Inc., Kroshka Taxi Inc., Persik Taxi Inc., Yagodka Taxi Inc., Murzik Taxi Inc., Malinka Taxi Inc., Starushka Taxi Inc., Corcovado Cab Corp., Kaisu Taxi Inc., Nusya Taxi Inc., Galusha Taxi Inc., Marusya Taxi Inc., Yanush Taxi Inc., Malysh Taxi Inc., Semya Taxi Inc., Druzhba Taxi Inc., Dusha Taxi LLC, Optimist Taxi LLC, Spasibo Taxi LLC, Epiphany Taxi LLC, Fade Taxi LLC, Tranquil Taxi LLC, Ken Service Corp., Dag Taxi Inc., Merry Cab Corp., Heby Taxi Inc., NY Sabra Taxi Corp., Forward Taxi Inc., NY Ubu Taxi Corp., NY Ynu Taxi Corp., NY Abar Taxi Corp., King Pierre Taxi Inc., Astra Taxi Inc., Cruiser Taxi Corp., B & D Ride Hacking Corp., Bimer Taxi Inc., Voin Taxi Inc., Sabor Taxi Inc., Ermitage Taxi, LLC, Pound Taxi, LLC, Boss Taxi LLC, Taganka Taxi LLC, Shekel Taxi LLC, Riviera Taxi, LLC, Bolivar Taxi, LLC, Marboro Hacking Corp., Motzkin Taxi Inc., Basnya Taxi Inc., Bazar Taxi Inc., Praga Taxi Inc., Torpredo Taxi Inc., Lacoste Taxi Inc., Hublot Taxi Inc., Prada Taxi Inc., Student Taxi Inc., Piguet Taxi Inc., Pumo Taxi Inc., Porsche Taxi Inc., Aragvi Taxi Inc., Arbat Taxi Inc., Breitling Taxi Inc., Vovchik Taxi, Inc., Bulibass Taxi Inc., Avar Taxi Corp., and Mamed Tax Inc filed by Steven R. Schoenfeld on behalf of Mamed Dzhaniyev, VLADIMIR BASIN. (Schoenfeld, Steven) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Application, Extend Time to File Schedules
Mon 11/20 4:24 PM
Application to Extend Time to File Schedules filed by Rachel A. Parisi on behalf of Downtown Taxi Management, LLC, Tunnel Taxi Management, LLC, 28th Street Management, Inc., Woodside Management Inc. Responses due by 12/4/2017, with presentment to be held on 12/11/2017 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 501 (MKV). (Parisi, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Application | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 11/17 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Mark G. Ledwin on behalf of Melrose Credit Union. (Ledwin, Mark) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter
Fri 11/17 3:23 PM
Letter to Honorable Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil as a Preliminary Response to the Letter of Gary Fellner, Esq. Filed by Steven R. Schoenfeld on behalf of Mamed Dzhaniyev, VLADIMIR BASIN. (Schoenfeld, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 11/14 3:49 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel A. Parisi on behalf of Woodside Management Inc., 28th Street Management Inc., Downtown Taxi Management LLC, Tunnel Taxi Management LLC. (Parisi, Rachel) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 11/14 2:57 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Gary M. Fellner on behalf of Woodside Management Inc., 28th Street Management Inc., Downtown Taxi Management LLC, Tunnel Taxi Management LLC. (Fellner, Gary) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice, Appearance
Fri 11/10 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Papers filed by Jonathan D. Forstot on behalf of Capital One Equipment Finance Corp. f/k/a All Points Capital Corp. d/b/a Capital One Taxi Medallion Finance. (Forstot, Jonathan) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting
Fri 11/10 12:18 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors . Notice Date 11/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice, Appearance
Wed 11/08 4:27 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Deborah J. Piazza on behalf of Deborah J. Piazza. (Piazza, Deborah) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 11/07 1:42 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Nathan Schwed on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. (Schwed, Nathan) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Appearance
Tue 11/07 1:36 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Jantra Van Roy on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. (Van Roy, Jantra) |
|
8 | 8
4
pgs
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Tue 11/07 12:36 PM
Order Signed on 11/7/2017 (I) Directing Joint Administration of Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. All Entries Shall Be Made In Lead Case No. 17-13150 (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
7 | 7
order
Application, Pro Hac Vice
Tue 11/07 9:27 AM
Order Signed on 11/7/2017 Admitting Warren J. Martin Jr. to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Nulty, Lynda) |
|
6 | 6
misc
341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC)
Tue 11/07 9:24 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 12/15/2017 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (One Bowling Green, Fifth Floor, Room 511). (Richards, Beverly) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission
Mon 11/06 11:03 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of Woodside Management Inc.. (Martin, Warren) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Mon 11/06 10:04 PM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Brett S. Moore on behalf of Woodside Management Inc.. (Moore, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
3 | 3
52
pgs
misc
Affidavit
Mon 11/06 9:38 PM
Affidavit OF EVGENY FREIDMAN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 1007-2 OF THE LOCAL BANKRUPTCY RULES FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK Filed by Brett S. Moore on behalf of Woodside Management Inc.. (Moore, Brett) |
|
2 | 2
27
pgs
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Mon 11/06 4:39 PM
Adversary case 17-01211 Complaint against Mamed Dzhaniyev, VLADIMIR BASIN, BORIS BASIN, MIKHAIL KATS, VERONIKA KATS, MAKISM KATS, GALINA SHEGELMAN, VAS TAXI INC., YELLOW CITY LLC, YELLOW DIAMOND TAXI LLC, YELLOW ROCKET TAXI LLC, YELLOW CARRIAGE TAXI LLC, YELLOW DEVIL TAXI LLC, YELLOW CRAVAN TAXI LLC, DANIYAL TAXI INC., DOCHENKA TAXI INC., TWINKLE CAB CORP., KING MARIO TAXI INC., JUNCO TAXI INC., CABBO SERVICE CORP., AL-ALL CAB CORP., LIBNOTH CAP CORP., PHILIP TAXI INC., KING ED TAXI INC., NY KFAR TAXI CORP., OAK TAXI INC., FLAMINGO TAXI INC., GORYANKA TAXI, GORES TAXI INC., DAMA TAXI INC., DANUSHKA TAXI INC., VOBLA TAXI INC., BRTISHKA TAXI INC., KORMILITSA TAXI INC., KROSHKA TAXI INC., PERSIK TAXI INC., YAGODKA TAXI INC., MURZIK TAXI INC., MALINKA TAXI INC., STARUSHKA TAXI INC., CORCOVADO CAB CORP., KAISU TAXI INC., NUSYA TAXI INC., GALUSHA TAXI INC., MARUSYA TAXI INC., YANUSH TAXI INC., MALYSH TAXI INC., SEMYA TAXI INC., DRUZHBA TAXI INC., EMO CAB CORP., PESNYA CAB CORP., ETILEE CAB CORP., ZODIAC TAXI INC., MIRA EXPRESS TAXI INC., KISKA TAXI INC., ATOLL TAXI INC., GORKY TAXI INC., MAKS AND DANNY CAB CORP., VOZDUX TAXI INC., PACE CAB CORP., ESQ TAXI LLC, PROTG TAXI LLC, SHOOTING STAR TAXI LLC, PIZZA TAXI LLC, NY PISCES TAXI CORP., NY COOKIE TAXI CORP., KATOM TAXI INC., DAVID TAXI CORP., DUSHA TAXI LLC, OPTIMIST TAXI LLC, SPASIBO TAXI LLC, EPIPHANY TAXI LLC, FADE TAXI LLC, TRANQUIL TAXI LLC, KEN SERVICE CORP., DAG TAXI INC., MERRY CAB CORP., HEBY TAXI INC., NY SABRA TAXI CORP., FORWARD TAXI INC., NY UBU TAXI CORP., NY YNU TAXI CORP., NY ABAR TAXI CORP., KING PIERRE TAXI INC., ASTRA TAXI INC., CRUISER TAXI CORP., B & D RIDE HACKING CORP., BIMER TAXI INC., VOIN TAXI INC., SABOR TAXI INC., ERMITAGE TAXI, LLC, POUND TAXI, LLC, BOSS TAXI LLC, TAGANKA TAXI LLC, SHEKEL TAXI LLC, RIVIERA TAXI, LLC, BOLIVAR TAXI, LLC, MARBORO HACKING CORP., MOTZKIN TAXI INC., BASNYA TAXI INC., BAZAR TAXI INC., PRAGA TAXI INC., TORPREDO TAXI INC., LACOSTE TAXI INC., HUBLOT TAXI INC., PRADA TAXI INC., STUDENT TAXI INC., PIGUET TAXI INC., PUMO TAXI INC., PORSCHE TAXI INC., ARAGVI TAXI INC., ARBAT TAXI INC., BREITLING TAXI INC., VOVCHIK TAXI, INC., BULIBASS TAXI INC., AVAR TAXI CORP., MAMED TAX INC., CREATIVE MOBILE TECHNOLOGIES LLC, CRUISER TAXI CORP. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)), (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) Filed by Brett S. Moore on behalf of Woodside Management Inc., 28th Street Management Inc., TUNNEL TAXI MANAGEMENT LLC, DOWNTOWN TAXI MANAGEMENT LLC. (Moore, Brett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Part 1 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Part 2 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
1 | 1
15
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 11/06 2:04 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 11/20/2017. Schedule D due 11/20/2017. Schedule E/F due 11/20/2017. Schedule G due 11/20/2017. Schedule H due 11/20/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/20/2017. Atty Disclosure State. due 11/20/2017. Employee Income Record Due: 11/20/2017. Incomplete Filings due by 11/20/2017, Chapter 11 Plan due by 3/6/2018, Disclosure Statement due by 3/6/2018, Initial Case Conference due by 12/6/2017, Filed by Brett S. Moore of Porzio, Bromberg & Newman, P.C. on behalf of Woodside Management Inc.. (Moore, Brett) |
|
misc
Add Judge
Mon 11/06 2:21 PM
Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Case Related Flag
Mon 11/06 2:37 PM
Case Related to: (Case Number: 16-13153 Red Bull Taxi Inc.) (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Terminate Pending Deadlines
Mon 11/06 2:42 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Set Deficiency Deadlines
Mon 11/06 2:47 PM
Deficiencies Set: Schedule A/B due 11/20/2017. Schedule D due 11/20/2017. Schedule E/F due 11/20/2017. Schedule G due 11/20/2017. Schedule H due 11/20/2017. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 11/20/2017. Statement of Financial Affairs due 11/20/2017. Atty Disclosure State. due 11/20/2017. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Due at Time of Filing. Declaration of Schedules due 11/20/2017. Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit Due at Time of Filing. Corporate Ownership Statement Due at Time of Filing. Incomplete Filings due by 11/20/2017, (Porter, Minnie) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/06 4:40 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-13150 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12276072. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Mon 11/06 11:06 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission 17-13150 mkv) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 12276435. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury) |