Gray et al v. Herick et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Richard P Matsch |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02665 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:0078m(a) - Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday May 06, 2018 2:58 AM MDT |
Defendant
Arrowhead Consulting, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary Jack Herick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
J Malcolm Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
TownCloud, Inc.
Terminated: 01/25/2018
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Friday, February 01, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Mon 02/04 9:22 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:35 Stipulation of Dismissal of Case filed by attorney Jon N. Banashek. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, ) |
|
36 | 36
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 02/01 2:46 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, with each party to pay its own fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/1/2019. Text Only Entry (ktera) |
|
35 | 35
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal of Case
Fri 02/01 1:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC.(Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
8
pgs
order
Protective Order
Wed 05/09 2:03 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/9/2018. (lrobe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
33 | 33
11
pgs
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/09 1:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/9/2018. (lrobe) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: State Court ESI Order | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 05/09 12:29 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held before Senior Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/9/2018. FTR: Kathy Terasaki. (lrobe) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
motion
Protective Order
Tue 05/08 2:33 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC.(Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Document, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 03/29 11:47 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE A scheduling conference will be held on May 9, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 30, 2018. The conference is conducted with lead counsel present in person. No parties or representatives of parties will be permitted to attend, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/29/2018. (ktera) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/02 12:20 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 02/15 8:46 AM
PROCEDURAL ORDER NUMBER ONE Counsel will meet and confer as required by Rule 26 (f)(2) within 30 days from the date of this order. Lead counsel shall attend the conference in person. The disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1)(A) shall be made within 14 days after that conference. Counsel for the plaintiff will telephone chambers [303-844-4627] within 10 days after the disclosures to set a date and time for a Scheduling Conference pursuant to Rule 16. The instructions for preparation of the Scheduling Order and the form of that order are found at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/judges/judges.aspx, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/15/2018. (evana, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
13
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 02/14 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Arrowhead Consulting, LLC, Gary Jack Herick.(Mark, Denis) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/05 1:20 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tara Sales LLC for Tara Sales, LLC. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Wed 01/31 9:56 AM
ORDER Denying21 Motion to Strike, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/31/2018. (ktera) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
9
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 01/30 5:45 PM
RESPONSE to21 Partial MOTION to Strike19 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading filed by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Order
Thu 01/25 1:02 PM
ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice of TownCloud, Inc. The22 Stipulation of Dismissal is GRANTED for good cause shown. TownCloud, Inc. is hereby dismissed from this action, with prejudice, with each affected party to pay their own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court and the Parties shall modify the case caption to reflect the Court's Order in all future filings, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 1/25/2018. (agarc, ) |
|
22 | 22
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Thu 01/25 9:37 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF TOWNCLOUD, INC. by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC.(Banashek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
5
pgs
motion
Strike
Wed 01/24 12:54 PM
Partial MOTION to Strike19 Notice of Filing Amended Pleading by Defendants Arrowhead Consulting, LLC, Gary Jack Herick. (Mark, Denis) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 01/10 3:55 PM
RESPONSE to16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Seventh Claims filed by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
19 | 19
2
pgs
misc
Notice of Filing Amended Pleading
Wed 01/10 3:53 PM
NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiffs J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC(Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 23 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A-Amended Complaint and Jury Demand | ||
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
15
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/26 9:34 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Jury Demand, by TownCloud, Inc..(Csajaghy, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 12/21 3:37 PM
ORDER Granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for defendant TownCloud, Inc. Attorney John Henry Schlie is withdrawn and NEFs terminated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/21/17. Text Only Entry (ktera) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
10
pgs
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 12/20 3:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth and Seventh Claims by Defendants Arrowhead Consulting, LLC, Gary Jack Herick. (Mark, Denis) |
|
15 | 15
3
pgs
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 12/20 3:22 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant TownCloud, Inc.. (Schlie, John) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Wed 12/20 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Erik Csajaghy on behalf of TownCloud, Inc.Attorney Stephen Erik Csajaghy added to party TownCloud, Inc.(pty:dft) (Csajaghy, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/14 4:06 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Advisory Attorney Noncompliance 2
Tue 12/12 9:37 AM
ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re:11 Stipulation filed by attorney Michael A. Littman. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (evana, ) |
|
11 | 11
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/11 7:42 PM
STIPULATION for Extension to Respond to the Complaint by Defendant TownCloud, Inc.. (Schlie, John) |
|
10 | 10
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 12/11 7:39 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Henry Schlie on behalf of TownCloud, Inc.Attorney John Henry Schlie added to party TownCloud, Inc.(pty:dft) (Schlie, John) |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint
Mon 12/11 12:18 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Arrowhead Consulting, LLC, Gary Jack Herick. Arrowhead Consulting, LLC answer due 12/26/2017; Gary Jack Herick answer due 12/26/2017. (Mark, Denis) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 12/11 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Denis Hugh Mark on behalf of Arrowhead Consulting, LLC, Gary Jack HerickAttorney Denis Hugh Mark added to party Arrowhead Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Denis Hugh Mark added to party Gary Jack Herick(pty:dft) (Mark, Denis) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Entry of Appearance
Mon 12/11 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Henry Schlie on behalf of Arrowhead Consulting, LLC, Gary Jack HerickAttorney John Henry Schlie added to party Arrowhead Consulting, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Henry Schlie added to party Gary Jack Herick(pty:dft) (Schlie, John) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 11/27 7:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC. Gary Jack Herick served on 11/23/2017, answer due 12/14/2017. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 11/20 8:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC. TownCloud, Inc. served on 11/18/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
service
Affidavit/Return of Service - Executed - Complaint
Mon 11/20 8:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by J Malcolm Gray, Tara Sales, LLC. Arrowhead Consulting, LLC served on 11/18/2017, answer due 12/11/2017. (Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
misc
Summons Issued
Wed 11/08 8:32 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rroge, ) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
2 | 2
misc
Case Assigned to Judge
Wed 11/08 8:18 AM
Case assigned to Judge Richard P. Matsch and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/07 7:40 PM
COMPLAINT AGAINST DEFENDANTS against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5795966)Attorney Kathleen Teresa Alt added to party J Malcolm Gray(pty:pla), filed by J Malcolm Gray.(Alt, Kathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |