District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Rudolph Contreras
Case #: 1:17-cv-02330
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2017
Terminated:Sep 21, 2018
Last checked: Saturday May 05, 2018 5:43 AM EDT
Defendant
RAO ABBAS
Defendant
HUMA ABEDIN
Represented By
Karen L. Dunn
Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP
contact info
Martha Lea Goodman
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Defendant
HINA ALVI
Defendant
ABID AWAN
Defendant
IMRAN AWAN
Defendant
JAMAL AWAN
Defendant
KIM FRITTS
Represented By
Matthew C. Hicks
Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered
contact info
Timothy Cone
Timothy Cone, Esq
contact info
Defendant
TOM PEREZ
Represented By
Caitlin M. Foley
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Bruce V. Spiva
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN PODESTA
Represented By
Caitlin M. Foley
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Bruce V. Spiva
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Defendant
HASEEB RANA
Represented By
Jesse Isaac Winograd
Gowen, Rhoades, Winograd & Silva PLLC
contact info
Defendant
GLEN SIMPSON
Defendant
NATALIA SOVA
Defendant
DEBORAH WASSERMAN SCHULTZ
Represented By
William Bullock Pittard, IV
Kaiser Dillon, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
ANTHONY WEINER
Defendant
PODESTA GROUP
Represented By
Timothy Cone
Timothy Cone, Esq
contact info
Plaintiff
JANE DOES
Plaintiff
JOHN DOES
Plaintiff
GEORGE WEBB SWEIGERT
8850 Hampton Mall Drive N.
Capitol Heights, MD 20743


Docket last updated: 02/14/2019 11:59 PM EST
Friday, November 02, 2018
56 56 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Cone (Cone, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
55 55 motion Sanctions Thu 9:58 AM
MOTION for Sanctions by PODESTA GROUP (Cone, Timothy)
Related: [-]