Bullock et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA. et al
Alaska District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy M Burgess |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-00010 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jan 17, 2014 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 22, 2015 5:29 AM AKST |
Counter Claimant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Frederick Bullock
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Renee Bullock
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Bullock
P.O. Box 1093
Sterling, AK 99672 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerica Bullock
P.O. Box 1093
Sterling, AK 99672 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renee Bullock
P.O. Box 1093
Sterling, AK 99672 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
National Bank of Alaska
Terminated: 06/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Terminated: 06/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, Alaska, NA.
Terminated: 06/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Terminated: 06/30/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM AKDT |
Monday, June 01, 2020 | ||
76 | 76
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/01 3:36 PM
ORDER : Plaintiffs'74 Motion Requesting Leave to Reopen for Relief from Judgment DENIED . (JDS, COURT STAFF) |