Wagner v. Geo Group Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | James T Trimble, Jr |
Referred: | Kathleen Kay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01491 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday May 12, 2018 4:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
Keith Cooley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Geo Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Wagner
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
utility
District Transfer/Remand Record Received
Fri 05/04 2:54 PM
REMAND RECORD RECEIVED by 33rd JDC-Allen Parish on 5/2/2018, assigned case number C 17-00401 (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Remand (Form Included)
Tue 04/24 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 33rd Judicial District Court for Allen Parish. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
15 | 15
order
Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Remand Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Report and Recommendations
Tue 04/24 4:27 PM
JUDGMENT adopting13 Report and Recommendations, granting6 Motion to Remand; denying6 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/24/2018. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 02/15 11:09 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Wagner. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Report and Recommendations
Wed 02/14 3:12 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re6 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michael Wagner. IT IS RECOMMENDED the Motion to Remand be GRANTED and the Motion for Attorney's Fees be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/14/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 02/14 11:11 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 2/14/2018. (jud,Kay, Kathleen) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 12/15 12:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to RD 10 opp to mtn to remand with consent by Michael Wagner. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay.(aty,Grodner, Donna) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum / Brief | ||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Wed 12/13 4:59 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re6 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Keith Cooley, Geo Group Inc.(aty,Gabb, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 11/28 2:19 PM
Response to5 Removal Order by Keith Cooley, Geo Group Inc of Compliance with Removal Order (aty,Gabb, Samuel) Modified on 11/28/2017 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Response to Removal Order
Tue 11/28 4:15 PM
RESPONSE TO5 REMOVAL ORDER by Keith Cooley, Geo Group Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as this document was electronically filed in error as 9 Notice. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 11/28/2017 to add document number. (Crick, S) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 11/20 2:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Keith Cooley, Geo Group Inc.(aty,Gabb, Samuel) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Motion Setting
Thu 11/16 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:6 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Remand Attorney Fees
Thu 11/16 11:27 AM
MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Michael Wagner. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay.(aty,Grodner, Donna). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees and modified docket text on 11/16/2017 (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum / Brief | ||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Removal Order
Wed 11/15 3:33 PM
REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 11/15/2017. (crt,Benoit, T) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 11/15 10:18 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Geo Group Inc. (aty,Gabb, Samuel) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 11/15 9:05 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 11/15 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Samuel B Gabb on behalf of Geo Group Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2017. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 11/13 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Removal from 33rd JDC Allen Parish, Case Number 2017-401 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3510565) filed by Geo Group Inc, Keith Cooley.(Attorney Samuel B Gabb added to party Keith Cooley(pty:dft), Attorney Samuel B Gabb added to party Geo Group Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Gabb, Samuel) |
|
Att: 1 State court petition, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 11/15 8:51 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge James T Trimble, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thigpen, M) |