Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12442

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:17-bk-12452
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2017
Terminated:Jun 20, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc.
17771 Mitchell N
Irvine, CA 92614-6028
Represented By
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. Motorsport Aftermarket Group files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (roadracingworld.com)
Submitted Thu 11/16/2017
Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Monday, November 05, 2018
10 10 claims Claims Register Mon 11/05 4:36 PM
Final Claims Register Alpha and Numeric . Filed by Donlin, Recano & Co., Inc.. (Jordan, Lillian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Numeric Claims Register
Wednesday, June 20, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 06/20 7:40 AM
Bankruptcy Case 17-12452 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2018
9 9 order Final Decree Tue 06/19 3:02 PM
Final Decree (A) Closing Certain of the Chapter 11 Cases, (B) Waiving Certain Reporting Requirements, and (C) Amending Case Caption Order Signed on 6/19/2018 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
8 8 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 03/06 1:45 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. for Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc. Filed by Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 03/06 1:44 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. for Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc. Filed by Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Tuesday, January 16, 2018
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 01/16 10:07 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. for Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc. Filed by Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Tue 01/16 10:05 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. for Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc. Filed by Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
Friday, November 17, 2017
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 11/17 12:36 PM
Order Authorizing Joint Administration. An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 1015-1 of the Local Rules of Bankruptcy Practice and Procedure of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Velocity Holding Company, Inc., Case No. 17-12442 Velocity Pooling Vehicle, LLC, Case No. 17-12441 Ed Tucker Distributor, Inc., Case No. 17-12444 Ralco Holdings, Inc., Case No. 17-12455 Rally Holdings, LLC, Case No. 17-12456 Tucker Rocky Corporation, Case No. 17-12458 Tucker-Rocky Georgia, LLC, Case No. 17-12459 Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc., Case No. 17-12452 DFR Acquisition Corp., Case No. 17-12443 J&P Cycles, LLC, Case No. 17-12445 Kuryakyn Holding, LLC, Case No. 17-12447 MAG Creative Group, LLC, Case No. 17-12448 MAGNET Force, LLC, Case No. 17-12449 Motorcycle Superstore, Inc., Case No. 17-12450 Motorcycle USA LLC, Case No. 17-12451 Mustang Motorcycle Products, LLC, Case No. 17-12453 Performance Machine, LLC, Case No. 17-12454 Renthal America, Inc., Case No. 17-12457 V&H Performance LLC, Case No. 17-12460 The docket in Case No. 17-12442 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 11/17/2017 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Thu 11/16 1:08 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12452 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8657443, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Thu 11/16 7:35 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case (LCo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Wed 11/15 7:08 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Velocity Holding Company, Inc.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
1 1 502 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 11/15 5:34 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Motorsport Aftermarket Group, Inc.. (Pernick, Norman)
Related: [-]