Doe 1 et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-06571 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday May 13, 2018 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 1
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 2
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 3
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 4
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 5
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 6
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 7
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 8
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe 9
|
Represented By
|
![]() ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 41 Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Using Pseudonyms. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2018) |
1. | Seven More Women Join Uber Sexual-Assault Lawsuit (thedailybeast.com) |
Submitted Fri 03/16/2018 | |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, December 17, 2018 | ||
64 | 64
![]() ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 63 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
63 | 63
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Jane Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 3, Jane Doe 4, Jane Doe 5, Jane Doe 6, Jane Doe 7, Jane Doe 8, Jane Doe 9, Uber Technologies Inc. (Christensen, Jeanne) Modified on 12/13/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF) |