Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Building Installation Group I, Inc.,
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50276 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 05, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Building Installation Group I, Inc.,
1609 Western Ave. Suite B
Green Bay, WI 54303 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 05/29 3:34 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Reset Trial1 ,16 . Trial Vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 2/25/2019. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, March 05, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 03/05 11:26 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50276] Closed. (btw) |
|
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 02/25 10:08 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Michael Ray Demerath, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc.,, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/30 8:36 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/28/2019, MATTER: Reset Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,16 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (295555)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Mediation Report
Thu 01/24 2:37 PM
Report of Mediation: Matter is Settled , filed by Andrew C. Ozete on behalf of Mediator Andrew C. Ozete . (Ozete, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing
Tue 11/13 4:05 PM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Andrew C. Ozete on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc.,, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Ozete, Andrew) |
|
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Mediator, Notice of Selection of
Mon 11/05 5:12 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Andrew Ozete, filed by Michael Ray Demerath, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc.,, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Order on Motion to
Tue 10/30 10:44 AM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Trial . Dispositive motions due by 1/25/2019. Exhibit List due by 2/22/2019. Witness List due by 2/22/2019. Trial date set on 5/28/2019 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Trial time allotted 1 day). Attorney for Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc., must distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Motion to
Fri 10/26 11:19 AM
Agreed Motion to Continue Trial filed by Michael Ray Demerath, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc.,, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
order
Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to
Mon 10/22 11:55 AM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation . Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 11/5/2018. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Mediation, Motion to Refer to
Fri 10/19 8:39 AM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
court
Minute Entry/Order
Fri 10/12 8:45 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/09/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,16 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289024)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Order on Motion to
Tue 07/10 1:40 PM
Order Granting Motion to Continue Trial . Dispositive motions due by 10/15/2018. Exhibit List due by 11/19/2018. Witness List due by 11/19/2018. Trial date set on 1/28/2019 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Trial time allotted 1 day). Attorney for Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc., must distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Continue Hearing/Trial/Pretrial Conference, Motion to
Tue 07/03 11:44 AM
Motion to Continue Trial filed by Michael Ray Demerath, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc.,, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/21 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Nicholas J Linz, Michael Ray Demerath on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc., . (Demerath, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/06 4:25 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/14 3:26 PM
Scheduling Order Setting Trial and Cut-Off Dates . Exhibit List due by 8/10/2018. Witness List due by 8/10/2018. Discovery due by 9/7/18; Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/18; Trial date set on 10/9/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. (Trial time allotted is 1 day) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/14 11:54 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules Trial for 10/9/18 at 9:00 am for one (1) day. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 02/06 12:59 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Michael Ray Demerath, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc.,, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Wed 12/20 1:01 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/6/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 2/13/2018 at 10:00 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3961. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/19 3:49 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Nicholas J Linz, Michael Ray Demerath on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc., .(Demerath, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 12/19 3:39 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Nicholas J Linz, Michael Ray Demerath on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc. (Demerath, Michael) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 12/14 12:30 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 12/28/2017. (cmd) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Appearance
Thu 12/14 10:47 AM
Appearance filed by Nicholas J Linz on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc. (Linz, Nicholas) |
|
12 | 12
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to
Thu 12/14 9:43 AM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney for Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc., must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Wed 12/13 7:30 PM
Receipt of Pro Hac Vice Appearance Filing Fee for $100.00. Receipt Number 288776. (MD) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Tue 12/12 8:57 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Nicholas J Linz. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $100.00 filing fee is due for the Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed on 12/7/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 12/19/2017. (cmd) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 12/11 10:39 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Deficiency to be cured by 12/26/2017. (cmd) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/11 10:17 AM
Appearance filed by Michael Ray Demerath on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc. (Demerath, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to
Mon 12/11 9:34 AM
Order Granting Motion filed by Michael Ray Demerath on behalf of Defendant to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney for Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc., must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear
Thu 12/07 11:11 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Nicholas J Linz on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc. (Linz, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear
Wed 12/06 1:29 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Michael Ray Demerath on behalf of Defendant Building Installation Group I, Inc. (Demerath, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 12/06 1:42 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50276 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27968365. Fee amount 100.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/22 11:56 AM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Building Installation Group I, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 11:11 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 10:40 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Deficiency Notice - Adversary Proceeding
Fri 11/17 12:24 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint . Appearance pursuant to Local Rule B-9010-1 due by 12/01/2017. (btw) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/17 9:58 AM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50276 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Building Installation Group I, Inc., [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 11/17 4:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50276 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27905268. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |