Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Coast to Coast Imports, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50278 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Coast to Coast Imports, LLC
1711 Latham Street
Memphis, TN 38106 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 06/26 8:40 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50278] Closed. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 06/18 11:49 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mediation Report
Tue 05/21 11:28 AM
Report of Mediation: Matter is Settled , filed by Mark E. Felger on behalf of Mediator Mark E Felger . (Felger, Mark) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Wed 05/15 9:11 AM
Minute Entry/Order: Continued Telephonic Pretrial Conference vacated 1,8. Order entered 2/19/2019 Referring Matter to Mediation. (lat) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing
Thu 03/07 4:56 PM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Mark E. Felger on behalf of Mediator Mark E Felger . (Felger, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, February 27, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Mediator, Notice of Selection of
Wed 02/27 12:44 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Mark Felger, filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 19, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to
Tue 02/19 11:11 AM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation . Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 3/5/2019. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Friday, February 15, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Mediation, Motion to Refer to
Fri 02/15 3:02 PM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 02/07 11:45 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/05/2019, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (302711)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 01/29 10:45 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Fri 12/07 3:23 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 1/29/2019. Pretrial Conference set on 2/5/2019 at 10:15 AM EST via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/06 5:21 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC . (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Appearance
Thu 12/06 5:01 PM
Appearance filed by Michael K. McCrory on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC. (McCrory, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Thu 12/06 3:26 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC [Corporate Parent(s): Coast to Coast Global, LLC]. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Thu 12/06 3:24 PM
Appearance filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Coast to Coast Imports, LLC. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/22 12:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Coast to Coast Imports, LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 11:13 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 10:48 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/17 12:30 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50278 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Coast to Coast Imports, LLC [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 11/17 4:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50278 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27905268. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |