Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50284 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 10, 2020 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
10200 David Taylor Drive
Charlotte, NC 28262 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, January 10, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 01/10 4:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding 1:17-ap-50284 Closed. (btw) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Fri 01/10 11:19 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by James A. Knauer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Authority, Order on Motion for
Fri 02/02 1:54 PM
Order Granting Motion for Authority Granting Stay of Adversary Proceeding . Attorney for Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Attorney for Debtor must distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Authority, Motion for
Wed 01/31 12:01 PM
Agreed Motion for Authority to Stay Adversary Proceeding filed by Jeffrey A Hokanson on behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Hokanson, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Thu 12/21 10:10 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 1/31/2018. Attorney for Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Defendant Frigidaire Consignment must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Wed 12/20 3:03 PM
Appearance filed by Steven Eric Runyan on behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Runyan, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Wed 12/20 3:02 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by James A. Knauer on behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Knauer, James) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/20 3:01 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by James A. Knauer on behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Electrolux North America, Inc.]. (Knauer, James) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Wed 12/20 2:58 PM
Appearance filed by James A. Knauer on behalf of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Knauer, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/22 12:03 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Electrolux Home Products, Inc. dba Frigidaire Consignment . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 11:18 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 10:52 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/17 12:48 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50284 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Electrolux Home Products, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 11/17 4:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50284 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27905268. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |