Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50290
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2017
Terminated:Jun 26, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jofran Inc.
1 Jofran Way
Norfolk, MA 02056
Represented By
Jofran Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 26, 2019
19 19 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 06/26 8:54 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50290] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
18 18 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Tue 06/18 11:43 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2019
17 17 misc Mediation Report Tue 05/21 11:31 AM
Report of Mediation: Matter is Settled , filed by Mark E. Felger on behalf of Mediator Mark E. Felger Related [+]. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, May 14, 2019
16 16 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Wed 05/15 9:11 AM
Minute Entry/Order: Continued Telephonic Pretrial Conference vacated 1,8. Order entered 2/19/2019 Referring Matter to Mediation. (lat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2019
15 15 misc Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing Thu 03/07 5:04 PM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Mark E. Felger on behalf of Mediator Mark E. Felger Related [+]. (Felger, Mark)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
14 14 misc Mediator, Notice of Selection of Wed 02/27 12:41 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Mark Felger, filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
13 13 order Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to Tue 02/19 11:07 AM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation Related [+]. Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 3/5/2019. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (btw)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, February 15, 2019
12 12 motion Mediation, Motion to Refer to Fri 02/15 2:58 PM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
11 11 court Minute Entry/Order Thu 02/07 11:45 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/05/2019, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (302708)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 29, 2019
10 10 misc Pretrial Statement Tue 01/29 10:49 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Friday, December 07, 2018
9 9 order Setting Pretrial Conference Fri 12/07 3:19 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 1/29/2019. Pretrial Conference set on 2/5/2019 at 09:30 AM EST via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/06 5:07 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Michael K. McCrory on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc Related [+]. (McCrory, Michael)
Related: [-] 1
7 7 notice Appearance Thu 12/06 4:55 PM
Appearance filed by Michael K. McCrory on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc. (McCrory, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 12/06 2:51 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Thu 12/06 2:49 PM
Appearance filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Jofran Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 12:07 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Jofran Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, November 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 11/20 11:23 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 10:56 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 1:00 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50290 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Jofran Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 11/17 4:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50290 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27905268. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1